This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2019 at 07:27:12 (UTC).

Olson v. Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Olson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles R. Wolle and Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles R. Wolle

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew B Olson

Matthew B. Olson

Defendant

Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond R Aranza

Attorney at WALENTINE O'TOOLE MCQUILLAN & GORDON

11240 Davenport Street, P O Box 540125

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Joseph Muldoon

Attorney at TELPNER PETERSON LAW FIRM, LLP

25 Main Place, Ste 200

Council Blufffs, IA 51502-0248

Stephen B. Maule

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131

Rex P. Fennessey

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131

John J. Marino, Jr.

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 North Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial Dismissal

#2

1 #6

Exhibit 6- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit 5- Jury Verdict Information

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Maureen Maley

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC Information

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Stephen B. Maule

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 7/27/2020 9:00 AM in Council Bluffs Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. for estimated 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in Council Bluffs Courthouse. Initial Disclosures due by 5/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/1/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/12/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/30/2019. Discovery Deadline 12/2/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/11/2019. Attorney Raymond Aranza appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Rex Fennessey appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 20 minutes. (jeb) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added as presider. Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (sjc) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties, and in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636 (c), the parties waive their right to proceed before a Judge of the United States District Court and consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/8/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER. Because the parties have consented to trial, disposition and judgment by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the hearing scheduled to be held by the undersigned judge on 4/10/19 is canceled. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/8/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Hearings re TEXT ORDER #17 : Motion Hearing is set for 4/10/2019 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference. Counsel shall call 1-888-636-3807 and enter code 5261674. Hearing will be held before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. (sjc) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Set Hearing: Hearing by telephone conference call 10:00 a.m. on 4/10/19. See order for call-in number. (alb) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TEXT ORDER. Hearing on defendant's resisted motion for partial summary judgment (Docket #2 ) will be held by telephone conference call at 10:00 a.m. on April 10, 2019. Counsel wishing to participate in the hearing shall phone 1-888-636-3807, using the Access Code 5261674. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/1/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen B. Maule; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Marino Jr.; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rex P. Fennessey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 2/22/2019. (kjw) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3740245 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt number 0863-3740187 by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) Modified on 2/21/2019, added payment information (kjw). (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt number 0863-3738272 by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) Modified on 2/21/2019, added payment information (kjw). (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **Attorney to refile motions correctly and pay the fee** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) Modified on 2/21/2019 (kjw). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. (Muldoon, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Amended Complaint by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC.(Muldoon, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief in Amended Complaint by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial Dismissal)(Muldoon, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/13/2019. 7.1 packet emailed to counsel. (sjc) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC from Iowa District Court In and For Pottawattamie County, case number CVCV118440. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3731956., filed by Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Pleadings, Process, and Orders, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Stephen B. Maule, #3 Exhibit 3- Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC Information, #4 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Maureen Maley, #5 Exhibit 5- Jury Verdict Information, #6 Exhibit 6- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Muldoon, Ryan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond Ralph Aranza