This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2022 at 08:29:32 (UTC).

Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc. et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susie Morgan and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02025

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

OSC Management, Inc.

Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd.

Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership

Old Man River, LP

St. Rose Associates, Ltd.

Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd.

Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership

College Towne Partnership

Green Oaks Associates, Ltd.

Cedar Court Associates, Ltd.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Cate Biggs Vosbein

Attorney at Long & Long, P.C.

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr. N.

Mobile, AL 36608

Andrea Butler

Attorney at Long & Long, P.C.

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr. N

Mobile, AL 36608

Billy Loftin, Jr.

Attorney at Loftin & LeBlanc LLC

410 E. College Street Ste. A

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

D. Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J. Rew

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle M. Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R. Stedman, II

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER re #16 Joint Voluntary Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is dismissed without prejudice, each party reserving all rights under law and the policy of insurance, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. All other existing dates and deadlines in this matter are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/22/2022.(pp) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) Notice of Compliance Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) Modified text on 8/1/2022 (pp). (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#13

(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/20/2022. On or before August 15, 2022, Plaintiffs shall either 1) file a second amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of each of the Plaintiffs and the citizenship of the Names underwriting the relevant policies issued by Defendant Certain Underwritersa Lloyd's, London, or 2) file a motion seeking jurisdictional discovery regarding the identity and citizenship of the Names. (ko) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

11 #1

Pro Hac Vice Notice

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

10 #10

Main Document

8 #4

Proposed Order

8 #3

Exhibit C-ECF Consent

8 #2

Exhibit B-Declaration of Andrea Faye Butler

8 #1

Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing

8 #8

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #16 Joint Voluntary Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is dismissed without prejudice, each party reserving all rights under law and the policy of insurance, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. All other existing dates and deadlines in this matter are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/22/2022.(pp) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Joint Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE and Old Republic Union Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs and Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vosbein, Cate) Modified text on 8/22/2022 (pp). (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #10 Complaint and Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Airport Road Associates, Limited, Cedar Court Associates, Ltd., College Towne Partnership, Green Oaks Associates, Ltd., Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd., Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, OSC Management, Inc., Old Man River, LP, Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc, Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, St. Rose Associates, Ltd., Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vosbein, Cate) Modified text on 8/9/2022 (pp). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Compliance Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) Modified text on 8/1/2022 (pp). (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/20/2022. On or before August 15, 2022, Plaintiffs shall either 1) file a second amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of each of the Plaintiffs and the citizenship of the Names underwriting the relevant policies issued by Defendant Certain Underwritersa Lloyd's, London, or 2) file a motion seeking jurisdictional discovery regarding the identity and citizenship of the Names. (ko) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrea Butler. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (lw) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by HDI Global Specialty SE, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Steadfast Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) Modified text on 7/19/2022 (pp). (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a telephone conference is hereby set for Wednesday, 7/20/2022, at 2:00 p.m. The Court will provide all parties with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in this conference. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/15/2022.(pp) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Butler (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9448050) by Airport Road Associates, Limited, Cedar Court Associates, Ltd., College Towne Partnership, Green Oaks Associates, Ltd., Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd., Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, OSC Management, Inc., Old Man River, LP, Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc, Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, St. Rose Associates, Ltd., Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Andrea Faye Butler, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Consent, #4 Proposed Order)(Vosbein, Cate) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Airport Road Associates, Limited, Cedar Court Associates, Ltd., College Towne Partnership, Green Oaks Associates, Ltd., Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd., Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, OSC Management, Inc., Old Man River, LP, Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc, Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, St. Rose Associates, Ltd., Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd. Identifying Corporate Parent Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc. for all Plaintiffs (Vosbein, Cate) Modified text on 7/18/2022 (lw). (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Green Oaks Associates, Ltd., Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd., OSC Management, Inc., Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc, St. Rose Associates, Ltd., Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd., Airport Road Associates, Limited, Cedar Court Associates, Ltd., Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, College Towne Partnership, Old Man River, LP.(Vosbein, Cate) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs amend their complaint by 7/22/2022, fully alleging the citizenship of each of the Plaintiffs and of Lloyds. As to the Plaintiffs, the amended complaint must set for the place of incorporation and principal place of business of any Plaintiff that is a corporation, and the amended complaint must set forth the names and citizenship of the partners of any Plaintiff that is a partnership. As to Lloyds, the amended complaint must properly allege the citizenship of the Names subscribing to the relevant policies. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/5/2022.(pp) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(pp) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9427099) filed by Green Oaks Associates, Ltd., Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd., OSC Management, Inc., Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc., St. Rose Associates, Ltd., Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd., Airport Road Associates, Ltd., Cedar Court Associates, Ltd., Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership, College Towne Partnership, Old Man River, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Lloyds, #3 Summons Indian Harbor, #4 Summons QBE, #5 Summons Steadfast, #6 Summons General Security, #7 Summons United Specialty, #8 Summons Lexington, #9 Summons Safety Specialty, #10 Summons HDI Global, #11 Summons Old Republic)Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Airport Road Associates, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Cedar Court Associates, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party College Towne Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Green Oaks Associates, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Jasmine Lane Associates, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Lancelot Square TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party OSC Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Old Man River, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Olsen Securities Corporation, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Pine Cliff TC-17 Associates Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party St. Rose Associates, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Cate Biggs Vosbein added to party Willow Ridge Associates, Ltd.(pty:pla).(Vosbein, Cate) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant