This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 07:49:35 (UTC).

Ollnova Technologies LTD v. Carrier Global Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Ollnova Technologies LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Carrier Global Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-80388

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ollnova Technologies LTD

Defendant

Carrier Global Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua David Martin

Attorney at Johnson & Martin, P.A.

500 W. Cypress Creek Road, Suite 430

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Brett Cooper

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew B. Hollander

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Seth Hasenour

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Anthony Romance

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

North Tower - 14Th Floor, 396 Alhambra Circle

Miami, FL 33134

Jahnathan L.D. Braquet

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste. 6400

Houston, TX 77002

Jonathan R. Spivey

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste. 6400

Houston, TX 77002

LaTasha M. Snipes

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste. 6400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

28 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension

28 #28

Main Document

27 #27

Main Document

26 #5

Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to R

26 #4

Exhibit D - CAFC Opinion - Roche v. Boveris

26 #3

Exhibit C - Claim Chart - Patent No. 8224282

26 #2

Exhibit B - Patent No. 8224282

26 #1

Exhibit A - Dkt. 1 Ollnova Complaint

26 #26

Main Document

1 #8

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant's deadline to respond in support of its Motion to Dismiss (DE #26 ) is May 9, 2022. Defendant seeks a four-day extension of this deadline, citing that lead counsel is finalizing preparation for a trial in an unrelated matter. Because the relief requested is brief and unopposed, I will grant Defendant's Motion and extend its deadline to reply to May 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/9/2022. (kal) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Carrier Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Ollnova Technologies LTD. Replies due by 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Carrier Global Corp.. Responses due by 5/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dkt. 1 Ollnova Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 8224282, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart - Patent No. 8224282, #4 Exhibit D - CAFC Opinion - Roche v. Boveris, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6))(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 , #22 , and #23 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Jonathan R. Spivey, LaTasha M. Snipes, and Jahnathan L.D. Braquet. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/7/2022. (kal) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jonathan R. Spivey. In light of Mr. Spivey's Corrected Motion (DE #21 ), this Motion (DE #20 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/7/2022. (kal) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jahnathan L. D. Braquet. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15537559 by Carrier Global Corp.. Responses due by 4/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jahnathan L. D. Braquet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for LaTasha M. Snipes. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15537474 by Carrier Global Corp.. Responses due by 4/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of LaTasha M. Snipes, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan R. Spivey. (Executed Certification) Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Carrier Global Corp.. Responses due by 4/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification (Executed) of Jonathan R. Spivey, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan R. Spivey. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15537158 by Carrier Global Corp.. Responses due by 4/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan R. Spivey, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Seth Hasenour. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15501525 by Ollnova Technologies LTD. Responses due by 4/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Reza Mirzaie. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15501498 by Ollnova Technologies LTD. Responses due by 4/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Drew B. Hollander. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15501467 by Ollnova Technologies LTD. Responses due by 4/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brett E. Cooper. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15501399 by Ollnova Technologies LTD. Responses due by 4/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ollnova Technologies LTD. Carrier Global Corp. served on 3/14/2022, response/answer due 4/4/2022. (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jc) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Carrier Global Corp.. (jc) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ollnova Technologies LTD (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carrier Global Corporation. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-15469995, payment transferred from : 9:22-cv-80384 Ollnova Technologies LTD v. Carrier Global Corporation, filed by Ollnova Technologies LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Martin, Joshua) Modified text on 3/11/2022 (jc). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carrier Global Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaTasha Mabry Snipes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ray Spivey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Romance