This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 08:52:04 (UTC).

Ollnova Technologies Limited v. Emerson Electric Co. et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Ollnova Technologies Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Emerson Electric Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ollnova Technologies Limited

Defendants

Emerson Electric Co.

Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Brett E Cooper

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew B Hollander

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Seth Raymond Hasenour

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

J. Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Ollnova Technologies Limited . Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Ollnova Technologies Limited (pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE Notice Regarding Agreed Extension to Respond to the Complaint by Emerson Electric Co., Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Emerson Electric Co., Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#9

(#9) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. Emerson Electric Co. served on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. (sv) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Emerson Electric Co. (sv) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Ollnova Technologies Limited re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15890884), filed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Ollnova Technologies Limited . Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Ollnova Technologies Limited (pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Emerson Electric Co. answer due 6/13/2022; Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. answer due 6/13/2022. (sm3) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE Notice Regarding Agreed Extension to Respond to the Complaint by Emerson Electric Co., Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Emerson Electric Co., Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. Emerson Electric Co. served on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Verdant Environmental Technologies Inc. (sv) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Emerson Electric Co. (sv) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Ollnova Technologies Limited re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ollnova Technologies Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15890884), filed by Ollnova Technologies Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Stephen Ravel