This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2020 at 10:28:40 (UTC).

Olivier Bassil et al v. Jacques Webster et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Olivier Bassil filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Jacques Webster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05099

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benjamin Lasnier

Lukas Benjamin Leth

Olivier Bassil

Defendants

Cactus Jack Records, LLC

Jacques Webster

Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC

Sean Solymar

Ozan Yildirim

Nik Dejan Frascona

Grand Hustle, LLC

Jamie Lepr

Sony Music Entertainment, Inc.

These Are Songs Of Pulse

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Michael George Dean

Papa George Music

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Darren Keith Kelly, II

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Pierre B Pine

Attorney at McPherson LLP

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2326

Edwin F McPherson

Attorney at McPherson LLP

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph E Porter, III

Attorney at Joseph E Porter III Law Offices

206 Third Street

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Peter J Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cactus Jack Records, LLC, Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Inc., (McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Cactus Jack Records, LLC.(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC.(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Sony Music Entertainment, Inc..(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lukas Benjamin Leth, Benjamin Lasnier, Olivier Bassil, upon Defendant Sean Solymar served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Solymar, Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Grand Hustle, LLC answer now due 8/10/2020, filed by defendant Grand Hustle, LLC.(Attorney Joseph E Porter, III added to party Grand Hustle, LLC(pty:dft))(Porter, Joseph) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to These Are Songs Of Pulse answer now due 8/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant These Are Songs Of Pulse.(Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party These Are Songs Of Pulse(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 8/6/2020; Cactus Jack Records, LLC answer now due 8/6/2020; Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC answer now due 8/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Sony Music Entertainment, Inc.; Cactus Jack Records, LLC; Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC.(Attorney Edwin F McPherson added to party Cactus Jack Records, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin F McPherson added to party Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Edwin F McPherson added to party Sony Music Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lukas Benjamin Leth, Benjamin Lasnier, Olivier Bassil, upon Defendant These Are Songs Of Pulse served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joseph Bradshaw, Front Desk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lukas Benjamin Leth, Benjamin Lasnier, Olivier Bassil, upon Defendant Grand Hustle, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonathan Leonard, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lukas Benjamin Leth, Benjamin Lasnier, Olivier Bassil, upon Defendant Papa George Music served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Cayetano, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lukas Benjamin Leth, Benjamin Lasnier, Olivier Bassil, upon Defendant Cactus Jack Records, LLC served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wendy Reed, Employee, Eresidentagent Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Cactus Jack Records, LLC, Michael George Dean, Nik Dejan Frascona, Grand Hustle, LLC, Jamie Lepr, Papa George Music, Sean Solymar, Sony ATV Music Publishing, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Inc., These Are Songs Of Pulse, Jacques Webster, Ozan Yildirim. (lh) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Olivier Bassil, Benjamin Lasnier, Lukas Benjamin Leth. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Olivier Bassil, Benjamin Lasnier, Lukas Benjamin Leth. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Olivier Bassil, Benjamin Lasnier, Lukas Benjamin Leth, (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Olivier Bassil, Benjamin Lasnier, Lukas Benjamin Leth. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26737181 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Lasnier, Olivier Bassil, Lukas Benjamin Leth. (Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Olivier Bassil(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Benjamin Lasnier(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Lukas Benjamin Leth(pty:pla))(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY/ATV MUSIC PUBLISHING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pierre B Pine