This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2023 at 10:37:24 (UTC).

OLIVER v. NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 OLIVER filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC T TREADWELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00361

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY OLIVER RESTRICTED - CHECK FILER STATUS

Defendants

NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC

JOHN DOES 1-50

 

Court Documents

67 #2

Envelope

67 #1

Cover Letter

67 #67

Main Document

66 #2

Envelope

66 #1

Cover Letter

66 #66

Main Document

#65

(#65) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Oliver is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by April 25, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice on res judicata grounds. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions including dismissal of this case and a finding of contempt. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/12/2022. (kat) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

64 #2

Envelope

63 #63

Main Document

1 #11

Envelope

1 #10

Cover Letter

1 #7

PROPOSED SUMMONS SINCLAIR

1 #6

PROPOSED SUMMONS NEXTSTAR

1 #5

PROPOSED SUMMONS GRAY MEDIA

1 #4

PROPOSED SUMMONS GRAHAM MEDIA

1 #3

PROPOSED SUMMONS GATEHOUSE

1 #2

521CV361 PROPOSED SUMMONS GANNETT

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

178 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#67) DUPLICATE FILING NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2022: #2 Envelope) (ggs). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREMARK: In light of #66 Notice of Dismissal, this case is closed. (ggs) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#66) NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to the Entire Action Without Prejudice as to All Defendants by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#65) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Oliver is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by April 25, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice on res judicata grounds. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions including dismissal of this case and a finding of contempt. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/12/2022. (kat) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREMARK: Parties SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC, GANNETT CO INC and GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC terminated pursuant to voluntary dismissal filed at Tabs #62 , #63 , and #64 . (ggs) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#64) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to GANNETT CO., INC. by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#63) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS, INC. by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#62) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#61) NOTICE Supplemental Authority by GANNETT CO INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC re #34 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order dated 3.10.22)(BYRNSIDE, IAN) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#60) NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by SARAH T REISE on behalf of SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC(REISE, SARAH) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
11/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION to Compel Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER.(hdw) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to File through the Courts EC/ECF Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER.(hdw) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A: Subpoena to Produce Documents, #3 Summons Elizabeth Ryder, #4 Envelope)(hdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2021: #5 Request for Issuance) (hdw). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons GANNETT CO, #2 Summons GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP, #3 Summons GRAY MEDIA GROUP, #4 Summons NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, #5 Summons SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP, #6 Summons WJCL HEARST TELEVISION)(hdw) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER DENYING #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/4/2021. (kat) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Special Agent Process Server. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/14/2021. (kat) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Special Agent Process Server Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(hdw) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (hdw) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $ 402, Receipt Number GAM500041170,filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 521CV361 PROPOSED SUMMONS GANNETT, #3 PROPOSED SUMMONS GATEHOUSE, #4 PROPOSED SUMMONS GRAHAM MEDIA, #5 PROPOSED SUMMONS GRAY MEDIA, #6 PROPOSED SUMMONS NEXTSTAR, #7 PROPOSED SUMMONS SINCLAIR, #8 PROPOSED SUMMONS WJCL, #9 NOTICE of Interested Parties, #10 Cover Letter, #11 Envelope)(hdw) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less