This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2022 at 05:28:48 (UTC).

OLIVER v. NAVY FEDERAL FINANCIAL GROUP LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 OLIVER filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NAVY FEDERAL FINANCIAL GROUP LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC T TREADWELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY OLIVER

Abbeville, GA 31001

Defendants

NAVY FEDERAL FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

FCA US LLC

TRANSUNION LLC

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

FIRST PREMIER BANK

CAPITAL ONE SERVICES LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC

 

Court Documents

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00656. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#10

(#10) TRANSFER ORDER. #8 Motion to Transfer Case is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. #6 Motion to Transfer Case is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/18/2022. Copies mailed 1/19/2022. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Summons

#9

(#9) Submission by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Letter

#8

(#8) MOTION to Transfer Case by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Summons

#7

(#7) Submission by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

6 #2

Envelope

6 #1

Letter

#6

(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case (SUBJECT TO DEFECT - unsigned) by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) Modified on 1/7/2022 to reflect defect. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Oliver. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Letter

#4

(#4) MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Capital One Services, L.L.C., Equifax Information Services, L.L.C., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., FCA US, L.L.C., First Premier Bank, Navy Federal Financial Group, L.L.C., Transunion, L.L.C., filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 12/23/2021)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketREMARK: Docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff. (ggs) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL added. (ggs) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00656. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRANSFER ORDER. #8 Motion to Transfer Case is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. #6 Motion to Transfer Case is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/18/2022. Copies mailed 1/19/2022. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submission by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Transfer Case by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submission by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case (SUBJECT TO DEFECT - unsigned) by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) Modified on 1/7/2022 to reflect defect. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Oliver. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Capital One Services, L.L.C., Equifax Information Services, L.L.C., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., FCA US, L.L.C., First Premier Bank, Navy Federal Financial Group, L.L.C., Transunion, L.L.C., filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One Services, L.L.C., Equifax Information Services, L.L.C., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., FCA US, L.L.C., First Premier Bank, Navy Federal Financial Group, L.L.C., Transunion, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2021: #5 Receipt) (jmey, ). [Transferred from vaed on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAVY FEDERAL FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First Premier Corporation, agent of First Premier Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant