This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2020 at 11:39:18 (UTC).

Oliver v. Life Time Fitness, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Oliver filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Life Time Fitness, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02191

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Brendan Oliver

Houston, TX 77056

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Christopher Gilchrist

Life Time Fitness, Inc.

Technogym USA Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Thomas N Thurlow

Attorney at Thurlow & Associates

440 Louisiana, Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Scott Benjamin Novak

Attorney at Lorance Thompson PC

2900 N Loop W, Ste 500

Houston, TX 77092

Zandra E Foley

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins Irons LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Technogym USA Corp, filed.(Foley, Zandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Novak, Scott) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Brendan Oliver, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2020. (Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim by Brendan Oliver, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Brendan Oliver, filed.(Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brendan Oliver re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. An updated address could not be found. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Life Time Fitness, Inc., filed.(Novak, Scott) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Christopher Gilchrist, Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Novak, Scott) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court, case number 2020-34986 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24831350) filed by Christopher Gilchrist, Life Time Fitness, Inc..(Novak, Scott) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHNOGYM USA CORP is a litigant