This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 07:28:19 (UTC).

Olive Hill Street Partners, LLC v. SPC Owner LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Olive Hill Street Partners, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SPC Owner LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Donahue and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02003

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company

Olive Hill Street Partners, LLC

Defendants

SPC OWNER LLC, a Delawre limited liability company; and DOES 1-20, inclusive

Does 1-20, inclusive

SPC Owner LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter W Ross

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey and Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Charles Avrith

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas W Casparian

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

401 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Matthew Evan Lewitz

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SPC Owner LLC answer now due 5/26/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SPC Owner LLC.(Attorney Matthew Evan Lewitz added to party SPC Owner LLC(pty:dft))(Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Olive Hill Street Partners, LLC, upon Defendant SPC Owner LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Thomas W. Casparian, Counsel for Defendant. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant SPC Owner LLC. (et) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company, identifying Olive/Hill Street Partners, LLC as Plaintiff and SPC Owner LLC as Defendant. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30856040 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company. (Attorney Peter W Ross added to party OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company(pty:pla))(Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SPC Owner LLC answer now due 5/26/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SPC Owner LLC.(Attorney Matthew Evan Lewitz added to party SPC Owner LLC(pty:dft))(Lewitz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Olive Hill Street Partners, LLC, upon Defendant SPC Owner LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Thomas W. Casparian, Counsel for Defendant. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant SPC Owner LLC. (et) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company, identifying Olive/Hill Street Partners, LLC as Plaintiff and SPC Owner LLC as Defendant. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30856040 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company. (Attorney Peter W Ross added to party OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company(pty:pla))(Ross, Peter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLIVE/HILL STREET Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited Liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew E. Lewitz