This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:18:42 (UTC).

Olivas-Arenas v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Olivas-Arenas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00624

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hayri Olivas-Arenas

Defendants

Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.

2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Gregory Albright

Attorney at Naqvi Injury Law

9500 W Flamingo Rd., Suite 104

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Farhan R Naqvi

Attorney at Naqvi Injury Law

9500 W Flamingo Rd., Suite 104

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Defendant Attorneys

Robert L. Thompson

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

300 South 4Th Street, 11Th Fl.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Michael P Lowry

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

300 South 4Th Street - 11Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Robert Lance Thompson

Attorney at c/o Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

300 South 4Th Street, 11Th Fl.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Order Granting Arbitration Petition

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mardel, Inc. for Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Complaint

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff Hayri Olivas-Arenas. (Albright, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

1 #4

Hobby Lobby's Answer

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for The Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-LDP9 Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-LDP9 for 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#5

(#5) JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/8/2019. Motions due by 11/7/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-19-789767-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5502956) by 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Excerpt from LLC Agreement, #3 Complaint, #4 Hobby Lobby's Answer, #5 Plaintiff's Arbitration Petition, #6 Order Granting Arbitration Petition)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #5

Plaintiff's Arbitration Petition

#12

(#12) STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Plaintiff Hayri Olivas-Arenas. (Albright, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hayri Olivas-Arenas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Albright, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #2

Excerpt from LLC Agreement

#7

(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/31/2019.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Plaintiff Hayri Olivas-Arenas. (Albright, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/8/2019. Motions due by 11/7/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff Hayri Olivas-Arenas. (Albright, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hayri Olivas-Arenas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Albright, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/31/2019.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mardel, Inc. for Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for The Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2006-LDP9 Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-LDP9 for 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-19-789767-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5502956) by 2199 North Rainbow Boulevard Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Excerpt from LLC Agreement, #3 Complaint, #4 Hobby Lobby's Answer, #5 Plaintiff's Arbitration Petition, #6 Order Granting Arbitration Petition)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.