This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 07:03:31 (UTC).

OLIVA v. AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 OLIVA filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Cox Arleo and Jessica S. Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02642

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY OLIVA

Defendant

AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES E. CECCHI

Attorney at CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Defendant Attorney

ERIC R. FISH

Attorney at BAKER HOSTETLER LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Civil Actions No. 22-1757, 22-1878, 22-2392, and 22-2642, are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The Clerk shall establish a Docket for the Actions under Civil Action No. 22-1757 (MCA)(JSA). etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting pro hac vice admissions of Stuart A. Davidson and Alexander C. Cohen; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/9/2022. (sm) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

7 #6

Text of Proposed Order

7 #5

Addendum to Alexander C. Cohen Declaration

7 #4

Declaration of Alexander C. Cohen

7 #3

Addendum to Stuart A. Davidson Declaration

7 #2

Declaration of Stuart A. Davidson

7 #1

Certification of James E. Cecchi

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Letter from Eric R. Fish re: Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC R. FISH on behalf of AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY OLIVA. AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee received as to Stuart A. Davidson and Alexander C. Cohen $ 300, receipt number TRE127107 (kht) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Civil Actions No. 22-1757, 22-1878, 22-2392, and 22-2642, are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The Clerk shall establish a Docket for the Actions under Civil Action No. 22-1757 (MCA)(JSA). etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting pro hac vice admissions of Stuart A. Davidson and Alexander C. Cohen; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/9/2022. (sm) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation, Appointment Of Interim Class Counsel and Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #2 Declaration of Stuart A. Davidson, #3 Addendum to Stuart A. Davidson Declaration, #4 Declaration of Alexander C. Cohen, #5 Addendum to Alexander C. Cohen Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Eric R. Fish re: Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC R. FISH on behalf of AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo regarding Consolidation of Related Actions and Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY OLIVA. AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13388730) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANTHONY OLIVA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Financial Resources Inc is a litigant