This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 09:28:58 (UTC).

Eliazar Olea v. Teichert Pipelines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Eliazar Olea filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Teichert Pipelines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01675

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eliazar Olea

Defendants

Teichert Pipelines, Inc.

Does 1 though 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Z Srourian

Attorney at Srourian Law Firm

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1710

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Sarkis Sirmabekian

Attorney at Sirmabekian Law Firm PC

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1710

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Cassandra M Ferrannini

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Alexandra K LaFountain

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#19

#18

#16

#14

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case #12 and Plaintiff Eliazar Olea's Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 , calendared for hearing on April 26, 2021 have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiff Eliazar Olea. (Sirmabekian, Sarkis) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eliazar Olea, (Sirmabekian, Sarkis) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Sonal Bellino, #3 Proposed Order)(Ferrannini, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. With both a motion to dismiss and remand pending, the Court hereby continues the hearing date on the Motion to Dismiss #12 , from April 5, 2021 to the same date as the Motion to Remand [17), April 26, 2021. The Motion to Dismiss remains under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case #12 , calendared for hearing on April 5, 2021 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 by Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (1) The document is accepted as filed. (2) The filing party shall file the Notice of Interested Parties not later than 10 am on March 30, 2021. (jp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Eliazar Olea #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Eliazar Olea. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Motion to Remand Case to State Court) (Sirmabekian, Sarkis) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.. (Ferrannini, Cassandra) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01675 RGK(PDx). (rn) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 11 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points in Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Ferrannini, Cassandra) Modified on 3/3/2021 (lom). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.. (Ferrannini, Cassandra) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eliazar Olea, upon Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Cassandra M. Ferrannini, Counsel for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Teichert Pipelines, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Eliazar Olea. Filed in State Court on 12/30/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc., identifying None. (Ferrannini, Cassandra) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV49707 Receipt No: ACACDC-30670477 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Teichert Pipelines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Ferrannini, #3 Declaration Bellino) (Attorney Cassandra M Ferrannini added to party Teichert Pipelines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ferrannini, Cassandra) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEICHERT PIPELINES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cassandra M Ferrannini