This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 10:42:16 (UTC).

Oldewurtel-Ilioff v. Vinod et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Oldewurtel-Ilioff filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Vinod. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00335

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff

Defendants

Divorce Docs LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Rovin Vinod

Southfield, MI 48076

AUTOM8 LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Moving Updates LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Business Basics LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Seneca Digital LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Legal Docs LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Quick Moving LLC

27166 Marshall Street

Southfield, MI 48076

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Damon W D Wright

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Patrick K Burns

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

Suite 520, 1101 King Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STATUS REPORT by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER approving #7 Status Report filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff; directing further briefing and consideration of #3 motion for TRO is stayed; cancelling conference call; setting status report deadline. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER confirming results of conference call; setting due date for status report; setting date for conference call, if necessary. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/19/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Supplemental to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Request for Hearing filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff Certificate of Service (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Emergency Request for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

3 #3

Text of Proposed Order

3 #2

Affidavit

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to AUTOM8 LLC, Business Basics LLC, Divorce Docs LLC, Legal Docs LLC, Moving Updates LLC, Quick Moving LLC, Seneca Digital LLC., Rovin Vinod (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

1 #5

Summons Legal Docs LLC

1 #4

Summons Divorce Docs LLC

1 #3

Summons Business Basics LLC

1 #2

Summons AUTOM8 LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9103543.), filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AUTOM8 LLC, #3 Summons Business Basics LLC, #4 Summons Divorce Docs LLC, #5 Summons Legal Docs LLC, #6 Summons Moving Updates LLC, #7 Summons Quick Moving LLC, #8 Summons Rovin Vinod, #9 Summons Seneca Digital LLC)(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS Order Approving #11 Status Report. A further status report is requested in this matter by APRIL 14, 2021. (Blake, Catherine) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Paperless ORDER aproving #9 Status Report filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff. A further Status Report is DUE 3/30/2021. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/16/2021. (nms, Chambers) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER approving #7 Status Report filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff; directing further briefing and consideration of #3 motion for TRO is stayed; cancelling conference call; setting status report deadline. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketTelephone Conference re: TRO held on 2/19/2021 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER confirming results of conference call; setting due date for status report; setting date for conference call, if necessary. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/19/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Supplemental to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Request for Hearing filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff Certificate of Service (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Emergency Request for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to AUTOM8 LLC, Business Basics LLC, Divorce Docs LLC, Legal Docs LLC, Moving Updates LLC, Quick Moving LLC, Seneca Digital LLC., Rovin Vinod (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9103543.), filed by Andrew Oldewurtel-Ilioff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AUTOM8 LLC, #3 Summons Business Basics LLC, #4 Summons Divorce Docs LLC, #5 Summons Legal Docs LLC, #6 Summons Moving Updates LLC, #7 Summons Quick Moving LLC, #8 Summons Rovin Vinod, #9 Summons Seneca Digital LLC)(Burns, Patrick) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Basics LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Damon W D Wright

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick K Burns