This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2021 at 10:26:44 (UTC).

Old Town Villages Condominium Association, Inc. v. FCCI Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Old Town Villages Condominium Association, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FCCI Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01379

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLD TOWN VILLAGES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

Old Town Villages Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendants

OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPANION PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

FCCI COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

RSUI INDEMNITY COMPANY

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBURGH, PA

FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

EMCASCO INSURANCE COMPANY

USF INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

State Farm Florida Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark A. Boyle, Sr.

Attorney at Boyle & Leonard PA

2050 Mcgregor Blvd

Ft Myers, FL 33901

Defendant Attorneys

Reed W. Grimm

Attorney at Taylor, Day, Grimm & Boyd

Suite 3500, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Katherine Anne Rafferty

Attorney at Taylor, Day, Grimm & Boyd

Suite 3500, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

John Michael Grimley, Jr.

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith, PLC-Pensacola

118 E Garden St

Pensacola, FL 32502-5624

Fotini Z. Manolakos

Attorney at Galloway Johnson

400 N. Ashley Dr.

Tampa, FL 33602-4351

Steven L. Worley

Attorney at Carr Allison

208 N. Laura Street, Suite 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Kristen Dana Perkins

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

110 Se 6Th St.

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-5059

Stephen Richard Gross

Attorney at Kelley Kronenberg, P.A.

10360 West State Road 84

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33324

Paige Samantha Newman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

110 Se 6Th Street., Suite 2600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Dustin Craig Blumenthal

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

222 Lakeview Avenue, Suite 800

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Michael Keegan Kiernan

Attorney at Traub Lieberman Strauss & Shrewsberry LLP

360 Central Ave Ste 1000

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3878

Nancy G Cook

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

255 S Orange Ave, Suite 1260

Orlando, FL 32801-3445

Stephen J. Rapp

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

255 S Orange Ave, Suite 1260

Orlando, FL 32801-3445

Holly S. Harvey

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Chelsey R. Pankratz

Attorney at Davis Law Firm

230 E. Adams Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Bret M. Feldman

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 2000

Tampa, FL 33602-5315

Lauren S. Curtis

Attorney at Traub Lieberman Strauss & Shrewsberry LLP

360 Central Ave Ste 1000

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3878

Richard E. Zelonka, Jr.

Attorney at Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman, LLP

1230 Peachtree St., Suite 925

Atlanta, GA 30309

Danielle N. Robinson

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

Suite 1100, 2400 East Commercial Boulevard

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33308

Stephen John Poljak

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

11Th Floor, 100 Ne 3Rd Ave

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#59

58 #1

Exhibit 1

#58

#57

#55

#54

#53

#51

#48

1 #20

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #17

State Court COMPLAINT Part 17

1 #13

State Court COMPLAINT Part 13

1 #12

State Court COMPLAINT Part 12

1 #8

State Court COMPLAINT Part 8

1 #6

State Court COMPLAINT Part 6

1 #3

State Court COMPLAINT Part 3

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Part 1

#1

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ENDORSED ORDER granting #59 Plaintiff, Old Town Villages Condominium Association, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant, USF Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Old Town Villages shall file a reply of no more than five (5) pages no later than 2/9/2021. Defendant USF Insurance Company may file an optional sur-reply of no more than five (5) pages no later than 2/23/2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/2/2021. (TNM) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION for Leave to File Reply to #58 Defendant USF Ins. Co.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Old Town Villages Condominium Association, Inc.. (Brockmeyer, Molly) Modified to create docket entry relationship and edit text on 1/26/2021 (KKH). (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE to Motion re #48 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by USF Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by First Specialty Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Westport Insurance Corporation, Corporate Parent SR Corporate Solutions America Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Swiss Re Corporate Solutions Ltd., Corporate Parent Swiss Re Ltd. for First Specialty Insurance Corporation.. (Grimley, John) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ENDORSED ORDER granting #51 First Mercury Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Clarification. Responses to the Complaint are stayed per Doc. 50, which effectively vacated the 1/4/2021 deadline for First Mercury's response. First Mercury need not respond until further order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/28/2020. (TNM) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER granting #53 Defendant USF Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Defendant USF Insurance Company shall have up to and including 1/15/2021 to respond to #48 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 12/23/2020. (BHC) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Essex Insurance Company. (Newman, Paige) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand by USF Insurance Company. (Zelonka, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsey R. Pankratz on behalf of Southern-Owners Insurance Company (Pankratz, Chelsey) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Unopposed MOTION for Clarification re 50 Order on Motion to Stay by First Mercury Insurance Company. (Booth, Spencer) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand, originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, case #CA20-0700, on 11/13/2020 by First Specialty Insurance Corporation.(KKH) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses and MOTION to STRIKE to #4 Complaint, originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, case #CA20-0700, on 10/23/20 by State Farm Florida Insurance Company.(KKH) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses and MOTION to STRIKE to #4 Complaint, originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, case #CA20-0700, on 10/23/20 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(KKH) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint, filed originally in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, case #CA20-0700, on 10/20/20 by FCCI Insurance Company.(KKH) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents by USF Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 State Court ANSWER, #12 State Court ANSWER, #13 State Court ANSWER, #14 State Court ANSWER, #15 State Court ANSWER, #16 State Court ANSWER, #17 State Court Pending Motions, #18 State Court Pending Motions, #19 State Court Pending Motions, #20 State Court Pending Motions, #21 State Court Pending Motions, #22 State Court Pending Motions, #23 State Court Pending Motions, #24 State Court Pending Motions, #25 State Court Pending Motions, #26 State Court Pending Motions, #27 State Court Pending Motions, #28 State Court Other Documents)(Zelonka, Richard) Modified to edit text on 12/9/2020 (KKH). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by USF Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Zelonka, Richard) Modified to edit text on 12/9/2020 (KKH). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to counsel Richard E. Zelonka, Jr. of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-1379-J-32JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, on 6/23/2020 filed by Old Town Villages Condominium Association, Inc. (See Doc #1 for all Exhibits to this Complaint.)(KKH) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit in and for St. Johns County, Florida, Civil Division, case number CA20-0700 filed in State Court on 06.23.2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17633793. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Part 1, #2 State Court COMPLAINT Part 2, #3 State Court COMPLAINT Part 3, #4 State Court COMPLAINT Part 4, #5 State Court COMPLAINT Part 5, #6 State Court COMPLAINT Part 6, #7 State Court COMPLAINT Part 7, #8 State Court COMPLAINT Part 8, #9 State Court COMPLAINT Part 9, #10 State Court COMPLAINT Part 10, #11 State Court COMPLAINT Part 11, #12 State Court COMPLAINT Part 12, #13 State Court COMPLAINT Part 13, #14 State Court COMPLAINT Part 14, #15 State Court COMPLAINT Part 15, #16 State Court COMPLAINT Part 16, #17 State Court COMPLAINT Part 17, #18 State Court COMPLAINT Part 18, #19 Affidavit Notice of Service of Process, #20 State Court Docket Sheet)(Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD TOWN VILLAGES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. A FLORIDA NOT-FOR-PROFIT-CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Companion Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant