This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2019 at 07:37:55 (UTC).

Old Republic General Insurance Corporation v. Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Old Republic General Insurance Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Old Republic General Insurance Corporation

Defendants

David Allison

Glynn County Airport Commission

Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.

Sharon Allison

Glynn County, Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole C. Leet

Attorney at Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 E. Paces Ferry Rd., 1700 Salesforce Tower

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Karl Dix, Jr.

Attorney at Smith, Currie & Hancock, LLP

2700 Marquis One Tower, 245 Peachtree Center Ave., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30303-1227

Garrett E. Miller

Attorney at Smith, Currie & Hancock, LLP

2700 Marquis One Tower, 245 Peachtree Center Ave., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30303-1227

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #1

Exhibit A

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORRECTED FILING OF ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County, Georgia.(Dix, Karl) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORRECTED FILING OF ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County Airport Commission.(Dix, Karl) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County, Georgia.(Dix, Karl) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Glynn County Airport Commission.(Dix, Karl) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ceres Environmental Services, Inc.. (Dix, Karl) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Ceres Environmental Services, Inc..(Miller, Garrett) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Glynn County Airport Commission answer due 8/26/2019; Glynn County, Georgia answer due 8/26/2019. (ca) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. (Leet, Nicole) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Filing by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leet, Nicole) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leet, Nicole) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. answer due 8/13/2019. (ca) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Leet, Nicole) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/11/2019. (csr) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2638823. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ceres Environmental Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Glynn County, Georgia is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Christine Leet