This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2020 at 09:13:28 (UTC).

Okyere v. John Bean Technologies Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Okyere filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against John Bean Technologies Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00190

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Okyere

Defendant

John Bean Technologies Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

4890 W. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Financial Disclosure Statement

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Peter Okyere. John Bean Technologies Corporation waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCase transferred in from Eastern Division on 05/07/2020. Case Number 4:20-cv-74-FL. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:20-CV-190-FL. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-74-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/7/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Gary Martoccio on behalf of Peter Okyere. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Peter Okyere (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - The Financial Disclosure Statement is a stand alone document. Counsel is directed to refile the financial disclosure statement using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against John Bean Technologies Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26OSS43V.), filed by Peter Okyere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement) (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary James Martoccio