This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 08:48:20 (UTC).

Okosi v. Roby

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Okosi filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Roby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11884

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Okosi

Defendant

Scott Roby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alycia M. Kennedy

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

One Federal Street, 27Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Daniel L. McFadden

Attorney at ACLU of Massachusetts

One Center Plaza, Suite 850

Boston, MA 02108

Areeba Jibril

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Massachusetts

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Jessie J. Rossman

Attorney at ACLU of Massachusetts

One Center Plaza, Suite 850

Boston, MA 02108

Matthew Segal

Attorney at ACLU of Massachusetts

One Center Plaza, Suite 850

Boston, MA 02108

Defendant Attorney

Nicole M. O'Connor

Attorney at City Of Boston Law Department

One City Hall Plaza, Room 615

Boston, MA 02201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Michael Okosi (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Scott Roby. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Michael Okosi (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie J. Rossman on behalf of Michael Okosi (Rossman, Jessie) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Affidavit of Areeba Jibril

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Scott Roby served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Kennedy, Alycia) Modified on 12/28/2021 to adjust correct party served (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#10

(#10) SEE attached NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2022 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/14/2022 to Complete Rule 26(f) Conference by Michael Okosi.(Kennedy, Alycia) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. O'Connor on behalf of Scott Roby (O'Connor, Nicole) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#14

(#14) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 1, 2022 to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Scott Roby.(O'Connor, Nicole) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/16/2022 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing #14 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to February 1, 2022 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant, Scott Roby, hereby moves this Honorable Court for an extension of time, up to and including February 1, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. The clerk shall reset the January 31, 2022 scheduling conference to a date during the week of February 14, 2022. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 1, 2022 to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Scott Roby.(O'Connor, Nicole) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. O'Connor on behalf of Scott Roby (O'Connor, Nicole) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing #11 Motion for Extension of Time to January 14, 2022 to Complete Rule 26(f) Conference. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/14/2022 to Complete Rule 26(f) Conference by Michael Okosi.(Kennedy, Alycia) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEE attached NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2022 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Scott Roby served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Kennedy, Alycia) Modified on 12/28/2021 to adjust correct party served (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Areeba Jibril. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Areeba Jibril Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9081901 by Michael Okosi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Areeba Jibril)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie J. Rossman on behalf of Michael Okosi (Rossman, Jessie) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Michael Okosi (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Scott Roby. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Michael Okosi (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scott Roby Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9064883 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Michael Okosi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Kennedy, Alycia) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less