This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 07:14:03 (UTC).

Okorie v. Nielsen et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Okorie filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Nielsen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A. Robinson and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02229

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chijioke Joshua Okorie

Respondents

L. Francis Cissna

Nelson Perez

Michelle Perry

Kirstjen Nielsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Oliver Hacking, III

Attorney at Hacking Law Practice, LLC

10900 Manchester Road, Suite 203

St. Louis, MO 63122-1200

Respondent Attorneys

Alan Thomas Simpson

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - KCMO

400 East 9Th Street, Suite 5510

Kansas City, MO 64106-2607

Christopher Allman

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - KCKS

500 State Avenue, Suite 360

Kansas City, KS 66101

Ozlem Barnard

Attorney at DOJ-Civ

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#16

No Description Available

#26

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/8/2019. Signed on 1/30/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/4/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 12/04/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #26 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Barnard, Ozlem) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to Dismiss (Barnard, Ozlem) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 unopposed motion to set July 1, 2019, as the deadline for defendants to file a motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Unopposed MOTION for extension of time request to set a deadline (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Barnard, Ozlem) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James Oliver Hacking, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hacking, James) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Allman on behalf of All Defendants. (Allman, Christopher) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Alan T. Simpson, Assistant United States Attorney as to All Defendants (Simpson, Alan) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ozlem Barnard on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry (Barnard, Ozlem) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • (#19) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to stay discovery and extension of time to file proposed scheduling order and to conduct Rule 26(f) conference filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to dismiss case (with Supporting Suggestions Incorporated) filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration Howlett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration Miller, #3 Exhibit 2A - Decision N400, #4 Exhibit 2B - Decision N336, #5 Exhibit 2C - NTA packet w N400 denial)(Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/8/2019. Signed on 1/30/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the partial cessation of the United States Government, the Court grants Respondents' motion for a 30-day enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition, Doc. #5 . Respondents' answer is due on or before March 7, 2019. Signed on 1/29/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to the Petition (in light of partial cessation of United States government filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Chijioke Joshua Okorie. L. Francis Cissna served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; Nelson Perez served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; Michelle Perry served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 01/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • (#3) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. On December 4, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiff to effect service on all defendants within forty days. That deadline has since passed. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause, on or before January 23, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to timely serve the defendants. Signed on 1/16/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/4/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry and U.S. Attorney's Office KCMO, Timothy A. Garrison. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry filed by James O. Hacking, III on behalf of Chijioke Joshua Okorie. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6058303. Service due by 3/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.] (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.