This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2020 at 07:56:11 (UTC).

Oklahoma City City of v. 100 Foot Wide Continuous Extended Term Easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Oklahoma City City of filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 100 Foot Wide Continuous Extended Term Easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oklahoma City City of

Defendants

Kaseca L Frank, Jr

Brent Grynnel Watson

Zelda Mae Kaseca Foreman

Vernice Longhorn

Brent G Watson

Zelda M Kaseca

Kahlahhalahc or Joe Mack

Roy J Kaseca

Darrell Dean Watson

Vernice C Longhorn

Elnora L Deer

Daniel Owen Watson

100 Foot Wide Continuous Extended Term Easement and Other Related Pump Station Continuous Extended Term Easements and rights-of-way for public utility water pipelines

United States of America

Thomas Aaron Watson

Zelda M Kawaykla

Franklin Kaseca

Patrick Scott Watson

Gregory Doyle Watson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsay N Kistler

Attorney at Hall Estill-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John F Kempf, Jr

Attorney at Hall Estill-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorney

Tom Majors

Attorney at US Attorney's Office-OKC

210 W Park Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE (other) by Oklahoma City City of Condemnation (Kempf, John) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom Majors on behalf of United States of America (Majors, Tom) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit List of Related Cases

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Oklahoma City City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Related Cases)(Kempf, John) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by John F Kempf, Jr on behalf of Oklahoma City City of (Kempf, John) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay N Kistler on behalf of Oklahoma City City of (Kistler, Lindsay) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Receipt for Money Received from Oklahoma City City of in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500078001 regarding #1 Complaint, (kmt) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Stephen P. Friot no longer assigned to caseEntered at the direction of the Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/7/2020. (rb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Map of the Atoka Pipeline

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Certified TSR - 820-472-B

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - List of Owners of Restricted Interests

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Description of Pipeline and Macomb Pump Station Easements

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Description of Allotment Tract 820-472-B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Oklahoma City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Description of Allotment Tract 820-472-B, #2 Exhibit 2- Description of Pipeline and Macomb Pump Station Easements, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Owners of Restricted Interests, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certified TSR - 820-472-B, #5 Exhibit 5 - Map of the Atoka Pipeline, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE (other) by Oklahoma City City of Condemnation (Kempf, John) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom Majors on behalf of United States of America (Majors, Tom) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Oklahoma City City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Related Cases)(Kempf, John) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by John F Kempf, Jr on behalf of Oklahoma City City of (Kempf, John) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay N Kistler on behalf of Oklahoma City City of (Kistler, Lindsay) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Receipt for Money Received from Oklahoma City City of in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500078001 regarding #1 Complaint, (kmt) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Stephen P. Friot no longer assigned to caseEntered at the direction of the Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/7/2020. (rb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Oklahoma City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Description of Allotment Tract 820-472-B, #2 Exhibit 2- Description of Pipeline and Macomb Pump Station Easements, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Owners of Restricted Interests, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certified TSR - 820-472-B, #5 Exhibit 5 - Map of the Atoka Pipeline, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 100 Foot Wide Continuous Extended Term Easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tom Majors