This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2023 at 07:37:41 (UTC).

Okcu v. Backblaze, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 Okcu filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Backblaze, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00614

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hatice Okcu

Defendants

Backblaze, Inc.

Brian Wilson

Sean Harris

Derman Uzunoglu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Noel Williams

Elissa Amlin Buchanan

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hatice Okcu. Derman Uzunoglu served on 2/25/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hatice Okcu. Backblaze, Inc. served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/17/2023) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#15

(#15) ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, SEE DOCUMENT #16 FOR CORRECT ENTRY*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Hatice Okcu as to Backblaze, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/17/2023) Modified on 2/17/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hatice Okcu. Sean Harris served on 2/14/2023, answer due 3/7/2023. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to Sean Harris. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Derman Uzunoglu. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Brian Wilson. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Backblaze, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hatice Okcu.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elissa Amlin Buchanan for Plaintiff Hatice Okcu (Buchanan, Elissa) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

1 #5

Summons Derman Uzunoglu

1 #4

Summons Sean Harris

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hatice Okcu. Derman Uzunoglu served on 2/25/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2023) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hatice Okcu. Backblaze, Inc. served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/17/2023) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, SEE DOCUMENT #16 FOR CORRECT ENTRY*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Hatice Okcu as to Backblaze, Inc.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/17/2023) Modified on 2/17/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hatice Okcu. Sean Harris served on 2/14/2023, answer due 3/7/2023. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Sean Harris. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Derman Uzunoglu. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Brian Wilson. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Backblaze, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hatice Okcu.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elissa Amlin Buchanan for Plaintiff Hatice Okcu (Buchanan, Elissa) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Proposed Summons should not be submitted as an attachment to the complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the proposed summons using the correct event "Proposed Summons." Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Hatice Okcu (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17979720.). Filed byHatice Okcu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Backblaze, Inc., #3 Summons Brian Wilson, #4 Summons Sean Harris, #5 Summons Derman Uzunoglu)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/10/2023) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less