This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 12:20:14 (UTC).

Cory Rae Ojeda v. Kaiser Permanente International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Cory Rae Ojeda filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Kaiser Permanente International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-01057

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cory Rae Ojeda

Defendants

Kaiser Permanente International, Inc.

Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc.

Brumie Jane C. Pepito

Does 1 to 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek L Tabone

Attorney at Law Offices of Tabone

6454 Van Nuys Boulevard Suite 210

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Emerson Joseph Bryant-Tabone

Attorney at Law Office of Tabone

6454 Van Nuys Boulevard Suite 210

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Defendant Attorneys

Sean T Strauss

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christian J Rowley

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Everett J. McLean

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc., Brumie Jane C. Pepito. (Strauss, Sean) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #5

Certificate of Service

8 #4

Proposed Order

8 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration of Mary Anne Madruga

8 #2

Declaration Declaration of Mary Anne Madruga in Support of Defendants' Moti

8 #1

Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-01057 MWF(GJSx). (rn) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc., Brumie Jane C. Pepito, identifying Southern California Permanente Medical Group. (Strauss, Sean) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Attachments: # 6 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. The document(s) should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-01057 MWF (SHKx). (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss

1 #1

Declaration of Sean T. Strauss in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08 and Orders of the Chief Judge 20-043 and 22-157, and Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds the MOTION TO DISMISS #8 appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for August 15, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc., Brumie Jane C. Pepito. (Strauss, Sean) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #8 filed by Plaintiff Cory Rae Ojeda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Derek L Tabone added to party Cory Rae Ojeda(pty:pla))(Tabone, Derek) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc., Brumie Jane C. Pepito. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mary Anne Madruga in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mary Anne Madruga, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service) (Strauss, Sean) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-01057 MWF(GJSx). (rn) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc., Brumie Jane C. Pepito, identifying Southern California Permanente Medical Group. (Strauss, Sean) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Attachments: # 6 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. The document(s) should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-01057 MWF (SHKx). (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc., Brumie Jane C. Pepito., filed by Plaintiff Cory Rae Ojeda.[FILED IN STATE COURT 04/05/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of San Bernardino, case number CIV SB 2207433 Receipt No: ACACDC-33535572 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Brumie Jane C. Pepito, Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean T. Strauss in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sean T. Strauss, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Attorney Sean T Strauss added to party Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean T Strauss added to party Kaiser Permanente International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean T Strauss added to party Brumie Jane C. Pepito(pty:dft))(Strauss, Sean) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T Strauss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian J Rowley