This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 20:43:06 (UTC).

OJ Commerce LLC v. Noco Company

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 OJ Commerce LLC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Noco Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01198

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJ Commerce LLC

Defendant

Noco Company

Not Classified By Court

Carol S. Cope

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shlomo Y. Hecht

3076 N. Commerce Pkwy

Miramar, FL 33025

Defendant Attorneys

Craig Stephen Barnett

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.

200 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 2100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

David R. Posteraro

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Sean P. Malone

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jon J. Pinney

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Marginal Entry Order: Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) is approved (Related Document #24 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/22/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#24

(#24) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

23 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#23

(#23) Motion to consolidate cases filed by Defendant Noco Company. Related document(s) #18 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

22 #1

Exhibit Certificate of good standing FL

#22

(#22) Motion for attorney Shlomo Y Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10045993, filed by Plaintiff OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing FL)(Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

21 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard

#21

(#21) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically. Conference call instructions to be sent via email. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(L,Ja) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#18

(#23) Motion to consolidate cases filed by Defendant Noco Company. Related document(s) #18 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

1 #14

Exhibit Ex. L

1 #13

Exhibit Ex. K

1 #11

Exhibit Ex. I

1 #10

Exhibit Ex. H

1 #9

Exhibit Ex. G

1 #8

Exhibit Ex. F

1 #7

Exhibit Ex. E

1 #6

Exhibit Ex. D

#1

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, (or to Transfer) filed by OJ Commerce LLC. Replies due by 3/16/2020. (Hecht, Shlomo) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/09/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Marginal Entry Order: Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) is approved (Related Document #24 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/22/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Motion to consolidate cases filed by Defendant Noco Company. Related document(s) #18 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Shlomo Y. Hecht for OJ Commerce LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #22 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/16/2020.(L,Ja) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Motion for attorney Shlomo Y Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10045993, filed by Plaintiff OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing FL)(Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Craig Stephen Barnett. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Shlomo Y. Hecht. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held telephonically. Conference call instructions to be sent via email. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(L,Ja) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #20 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet mailed to Craig Stephen Barnett, Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A., 200 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 2100, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 and Shlomo Y. Hecht, 3076 N. Commerce Pkwy, Miramar, FL 33025 on 06/01/2020. (M,TL) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Craig Stephen Barnett (Barnett, Craig) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, (or to Transfer) filed by OJ Commerce LLC. Replies due by 3/16/2020. (Hecht, Shlomo) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, (or to Transfer) by The Noco Company. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Weiner, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barnett, Craig) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Sean P. Malone, Jon J. Pinney, and David R. Posteraro,. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sean P. Malone, Jon J. Pinney and David R. Posteraro. Filing Fee $ 225.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12483623 by The Noco Company. Attorney Craig Stephen Barnett added to party The Noco Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Executed Certifications, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barnett, Craig) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Noco Company. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Noco Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12386648, filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Exhibit Ex. F, #9 Exhibit Ex. G, #10 Exhibit Ex. H, #11 Exhibit Ex. I, #12 Exhibit Ex. J, #13 Exhibit Ex. K, #14 Exhibit Ex. L)(Hecht, Shlomo) [Transferred from flsd on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 02/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OJ Commerce, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Noco Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shlomo Y Hecht