This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:59:59 (UTC).

OJ Commerce LLC v. Beazley USA Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 OJ Commerce LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Beazley USA Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-60214

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

OJ Commerce LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Beazley USA Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Shlomo Y Hecht

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles Collins Lemley

Matthew W. Beato

Gary P. Seligman

Bryce L. Friedman

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

#23

#20

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

17 #1

Certification

13 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

13 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#13

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Exhibit 1 continued

1 #4

Exhibit 1 continued

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Affidavit Declaration in support

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/30/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss #13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, for failure to state a claim and lack of subject matter jurisidiction by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Jeffrey Grubman as Mediator. (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020

Docket(#22) PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On March 11, 2020, the Court issued an Order [DE 15] directing the parties to agree upon a mediator within fourteen (14) days and to advise the Clerks office of their choice. From the record, it appears that the parties have not yet selected a mediator. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by April 2, 2020, showing cause why the Clerk should not be directed to randomly select a mediator from the list of certified mediators. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the Clerk selecting a mediator at random. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/26/2020. (mkz) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Matthew W. Beato ; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gary P. Seligman ; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Bryce L. Friedman. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/25/2020. (mkz) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss #13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, for failure to state a claim and lack of subject matter jurisidiction by OJ Commerce LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2020 (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bryce L. Friedman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12615563 by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gary P. Seligman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12615517 by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew W. Beato. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12615456 by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 3/13/2020. (jz) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 2/26/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Laurana Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/11/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
02/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Count I and Count II without prejudice by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Answer due 2/25/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Answer due 2/18/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Bryce L. Friedman, Gary P. Seligman, Matthew W. Beato, mailing date January 31, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beazley USA Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Beazley plc for Beazley USA Services, Inc. (Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint - state court) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12381621, filed by Beazley USA Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration in support, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 continued, #5 Exhibit 1 continued)(Lemley, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less