This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2020 at 08:04:53 (UTC).

OJ Commerce LLC v. Actiontec Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 OJ Commerce LLC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Actiontec Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62778

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJ Commerce LLC

Defendants

Jeff Runyon

Actiontec Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shlomo Y Hecht

Attorney at Shlomo Y Hecht PA

3076 N Commerce Parkway

Miramar, FL 33025

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Court Practice in Cases with Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) APPENDIX to #1 Complaint Exhibits A and B by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Actiontec Electronics, Inc., Jeff Runyon. (mc) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #3

Summon(s) Runyon

1 #2

Summon(s) Actiontec

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12128155, filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Actiontec, #3 Summon(s) Runyon)(Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Court Practice in Cases with Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPENDIX to #1 Complaint Exhibits A and B by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Actiontec Electronics, Inc., Jeff Runyon. (mc) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mc) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12128155, filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Actiontec, #3 Summon(s) Runyon)(Hecht, Shlomo) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OJ Commerce, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Actiontec Electronics, Inc. is a litigant