This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:38 (UTC).

OHLEMEYER v. LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 OHLEMEYER filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LVNV FUNDING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04828

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANA OHLEMEYER

Defendant

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Steinkamp

Attorney at JOHN STEINKAMP & ASSOCIATES

5214 S. East Street, Suite D-1

Indianapolis, IN 46227

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by DANA OHLEMEYER. LVNV FUNDING, LLC served on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, filed by DANA OHLEMEYER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756499) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The August 9, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff DANA OHLEMEYER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff DANA OHLEMEYER. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, any pending motions are denied as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 28 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/9/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - The August 9, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's counsel

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff DANA OHLEMEYER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, any pending motions are denied as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 28 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/9/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by DANA OHLEMEYER. LVNV FUNDING, LLC served on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (JRB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff DANA OHLEMEYER. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, filed by DANA OHLEMEYER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756499) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The August 9, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less