This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2019 at 07:44:50 (UTC).

Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts et al v. LaRose et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LaRose. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04466

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Doe # 2

Trevor J. Vessels

Brandon S. Lynaugh

John Doe # 1

Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts

David J. Eckert

Defendants

Frank LaRose

Zach Klein

Amicus Curiae

Building Laborers' Union Local 310

FirstEnergy Solutions Corp.

Central Ohio Green Education Fund

Ohio Citizen Action

Ohioans for Energy Security, LLC

Moms Clean Air Force

Ohio Environmental Council

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Curt Carl Hartman

7394 Ridgepoint Drive, Suite 8

Cincinnati, OH 45230

Brian C. Shrive

Attorney at Finney Law Firm, LLC

4270 Ivy Pointe Boulevard, Suite 225

Cincinnati, OH 45245

Patrick M Quinn

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 North Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Christopher P Finney

Attorney at Finney Law Firm, LLC

4270 Ivy Pointe Boulevard, Ste 225

Cincinnati, OH 45245

Joseph A. Vanderhulst

Attorney at LANGDON LAW LLC

8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Road

West Chester, OH 45069

Defendant Attorneys

Bridget C Coontz

Attorney at Ohio Attorney General's Office

30 E. Broad St., 16Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Ann Yackshaw

Attorney at Ohio Attorney Generals Office

30 E. Broad Street, 16Th Floor, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Andrew Donald Matthew Miller

Attorney at Columbus City Attorney's Office

77 North Front Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Lara N Baker-Morrish

Attorney at Columbus City Prosecutor's Office

375 S High Street, 7Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Ezio A Listati

Attorney at Thrasher, Dinsmore & Dolan, LPA

1111 Superior Avenue, Suite 412

Cleveland, OH 44114

John Wolcott Zeiger

Attorney at Zeiger Tiges Little & Lindsmith LLP

3500 Huntington Center, 41 S High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Stuart G Parsell

Attorney at Zeiger Tigges Little & Lindsmith LLP

3500 Huntington Center, 41 S High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Robert J Fitrakis

Attorney at Fitrakis and Gadell-Newton

1021 E.Broad St.

Columbus, OH 43205

Miranda Renee Leppla

Attorney at Ohio Environmental Council

1145 Chesapeake Avenue, Suite I

Columbus, OH 43212

Derek S. Clinger

Attorney at McTigue McGinnis & Colombo LLC

545 E. Town Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Donald Carl Brey

Attorney at Isaac Wiles Burkholder & Teetor, LLC

Two Miranova Place, Suite 700

Columbus, OH 43215-5098

 

Court Documents

#53

#52

50 #1

Opinion and Order

#50

#49

#48

RESTRICTED

47 #1

Exhibit A: AMICUS BRIEF OF CENTRAL OHIO GREEN EDUCATION FUND

#47

#32

4 #4

Exhibit D - Various public records requests seeking filed Form 15s from the Ohio

4 #3

Exhibit C - Letter dtd 30 Aug 2019 from Ohio Attorney Secretary of State certify

4 #2

Exhibit B - Letter dtd 29 Aug 2019 from Ohio Attorney General approving summary

4 #1

Exhibit A - Letter dtd 12 Aug 2019 from Ohio Attorney General rejecting summary

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 200COL059676 re #52 Notice of Appeal filed by Brandon S. Lynaugh, Trevor J. Vessels, David J. Eckert, John Doe # 1, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, John Doe # 2 (jlk) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) USCA Case Number 19-4141 for #52 Notice of Appeal filed by Brandon S. Lynaugh, Trevor J. Vessels, David J. Eckert, John Doe # 1, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts & John Doe # 2; case manager Bryant L. Crutcher, 513-564-7013. (er) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE OF APPEAL (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiffs John Doe # 1, John Doe # 2, David J. Eckert, Brandon S. Lynaugh, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, Trevor J. Vessels. (Shrive, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER issued in that this Court certifies questions of state law to the Supreme Court of Ohio as set forth in the Court's October 23, 2019 Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order) (cmw) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ORDER denying #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and CERTIFYING Questions to the Supreme Court of Ohio. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2019. (plb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 10-22-19, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 11/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (Coulter, Darla) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Central Ohio Green Education Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: AMICUS BRIEF OF CENTRAL OHIO GREEN EDUCATION FUND, #2 Exhibit B: DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY B. CHAVEZ) (Fitrakis, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) STIPULATION OF FACTS BY ALL PARTIES by Plaintiffs John Doe # 1, John Doe # 2, David J. Eckert, Brandon S. Lynaugh, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, Trevor J. Vessels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G) (Shrive, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE by Plaintiffs John Doe # 1, John Doe # 2, David J. Eckert, Brandon S. Lynaugh, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, Trevor J. Vessels (Declaration of Amy Sutherly) (Quinn, Patrick) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction With Respect to the Summary Statute so as to Extend the Circulation Period of the Referendum Petition in order to Allow for the Full Exercise of First Amendment Rights for the Full 90-Day Period Expressly Allowed by filed by Plaintiffs John Doe # 1, David J. Eckert, Brandon S. Lynaugh, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, Trevor J. Vessels. (Hartman, Curt) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Lara N Baker-Morrish for Defendant Zach Klein (Baker-Morrish, Lara) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument set for 10/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Donald Matthew Miller for Defendant Zach Klein (Miller, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Yackshaw for Defendant Frank LaRose (Yackshaw, Ann) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget C Coontz for Defendant Frank LaRose (Coontz, Bridget) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 65-. Telephone Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM via Teleconference before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw) (cmw). (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT /DECLARATION by Plaintiff Brandon S. Lynaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dtd 12 Aug 2019 from Ohio Attorney General rejecting summary on preliminary petition to subject H.B. 6 to referendum, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dtd 29 Aug 2019 from Ohio Attorney General approving summary on second preliminary petition to subject H.B. 6 to referendum, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dtd 30 Aug 2019 from Ohio Attorney Secretary of State certifying a sufficient number of valid signatures tendered with second preliminary petition to subject H.B. 6 to referendum, #4 Exhibit D - Various public records requests seeking filed Form 15s from the Ohio Secretary of State) (Hartman, Curt) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT /DECLARATION (redacted) by Plaintiff John Doe # 1. (Hartman, Curt) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 10/29/2019) by Plaintiffs John Doe # 1, David J. Eckert, Brandon S. Lynaugh, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, Trevor J. Vessels. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Hartman, Curt) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7144864), filed by Trevor J. Vessels, Ohioans Against Corporate Bailouts, Brandon S. Lynaugh, David J. Eckert, John Doe # 1. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hartman, Curt) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Environmental Council is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart G Parsell(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ezio A Listati