This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2020 at 07:11:24 (UTC).

Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Ohio Security Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against G G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05725

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ohio Security Insurance Company

American Fire and Casualty Company

Defendants

Craig Deaton

G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Justin Boos

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Corban James Porter

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning and Berman

1401 Willow Pass Rd Ste 700

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant Attorneys

John James McLeod

Attorney at McLeod Law Group

1155 Camino Del Mar, Suite 510

Del Mar, CA 92014

Paul Christian Hirst

Attorney at McLeod Law Group, A.P.C.

1155 Camino Del Mar, Suite 510

Del Mar, CA 92014

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/9/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Christian Hirst (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#14

(#14) *Duplicate Filing, please disregard* NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Christian Hirst for John J. McLeod, Esq. (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John James McLeod (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byG & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc.. (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by American Fire and Casualty Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The, Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Fire and Casualty Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Craig Deaton, G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Craig Deaton, G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14819163.). Filed byOhio Security Insurance Company, American Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/9/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #14 Notice of Appearance filed by G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Christian Hirst (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) *Duplicate Filing, please disregard* NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Christian Hirst for John J. McLeod, Esq. (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John James McLeod (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byG & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc.. (Hirst, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by American Fire and Casualty Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The, Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Fire and Casualty Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Craig Deaton, G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Craig Deaton, G & G Risk Management Consultants, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14819163.). Filed byOhio Security Insurance Company, American Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fire and Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Security Insuance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corban James Porter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Justin Boos