In re Meta Platforms, Inc., Securities Litigation

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16622581.). Filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Barry G. Depot. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Joost, #2 Exhibit A_OH Public Emps Ret Sys Complaint, #3 Exhibit B_Depot Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (7 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Barry G. Depot. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 23, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Publication by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ohio Notice of Pendency, #2 Exhibit B - Ngian Notice of Pendency, #3 Exhibit C - Depot Notice of Pendency)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. on 11/16/2021, filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg and Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16688661.) filed by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (Rouhandeh, James) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16688672.) filed by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (Duggan, Charles) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James P. Rouhandeh.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Charles S. Duggan. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Stipulation Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2021) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/13/2021. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 20, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/10/2022. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan D. Uslaner, #2 Exhibit A - PFA Pension Certification, #3 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #4 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Hartzmark Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - Bernstein Litowitz Resume, #7 Exhibit F - Symantec Order, #8 Exhibit G - Exxon Order, #9 Exhibit H - James River Order, #10 Proposed Order)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Jay Robbins (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Certificate of Interested Entities by PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab identifying Corporate Parent PFA Holding A/S for PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:21-cv-08812-JST; 4:21-cv-08873-JST; and 4:21-cv-09041-JST, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Wee Ann Ngian. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/10/2022. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Jonathan D. Uslaner by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by California Public Employees' Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/10/2022. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darren J. Robbins in Support, #2 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Certification, #4 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Matthew Jacobs, #6 Proposed Order)(Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:21-cv-08812-JST; 4:21-cv-08873-JST; and 4:21-cv-09041-JST MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byWee Ann Ngian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Hannah Ross by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Certificate of Interested Entities by California Public Employees' Retirement System (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Shawn A. Williams on behalf of California Public Employees' Retirement System (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Avi Josefson by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Darren Jay Robbins on behalf of California Public Employees' Retirement System (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Jeroen van Kwawegen by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wee Ann Ngian (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Willow E. Radcliffe on behalf of California Public Employees' Retirement System (Radcliffe, Willow) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Daniel S. Drosman on behalf of California Public Employees' Retirement System (Drosman, Daniel) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Wee Ann Ngian (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Scott R. Foglietta by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Jason A. Forge on behalf of California Public Employees' Retirement System (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Shawn Busken by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of Ohio Public Employees Retirement System (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Hadiya Khan Deshmukh on behalf of California Public Employees' Retirement System (Deshmukh, Hadiya) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearings and setting Zoom Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). The Motions set for 2/3/2022 are CONTINUED due to being set on a date that is closed to further settings. All motion hearings set for 3/10/2022 will be held via Zoom. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:21-cv-08812-JST; 4:21-cv-08873-JST; and 4:21-cv-09041-JST MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof.,. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who w ish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 9, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 02: 00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Related documents(s) #22 )(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Marie Rios (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Certificate of Interested Entities by Rahul Saraf (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Rahul Saraf. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/10/2022. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sophia M. Rios, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Sophia Marie Rios on behalf of Rahul Saraf (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Appearance by David Reuven Lev Kaplan (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by KBC Asset Management NV. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/10/2022. Replies due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kaplan Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Certificate of Interested Entities by KBC Asset Management NV (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) CERTIFICATE of Counsel David Kaplan by David Reuven Lev Kaplan on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Christopher Moriarty by David Reuven Lev Kaplan on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Gregg S. Levin by David Reuven Lev Kaplan on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Joshua C. Littlejohn by David Reuven Lev Kaplan on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Wolfram T. Worms by David Reuven Lev Kaplan on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #50 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by KBC Asset Management NV (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Certificate of Interested Entities by KBC Asset Management NV identifying Corporate Parent KBC Group NV for KBC Asset Management NV. (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 12/28/2021) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Wee Ann Ngian re #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:21-cv-08812-JST; 4:21-cv-08873-JST; and 4:21-cv-09041-JST MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/10/2022) Modified on 1/10/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE by KBC Asset Management NV re #49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Statement of Non-Opposition re #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof Movant Rahul Saraf's Response to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions filed byRahul Saraf. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byOhio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan D. Uslaner, #2 Exhibit A - Ohio PERS and PFA Pension Letter, #3 Exhibit B - Ngian Transfer Order)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:21-cv-08812-JST; 4:21-cv-08873-JST; and 4:21-cv-09041-JST MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byCalifornia Public Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darren J. Robbins in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to Robbins Opp. Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Robbins Opp. Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Robbins Opp. Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Robbins Opp. Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Robbins Opp. Decl.)(Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) REPLY (re #49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byKBC Asset Management NV. (Kaplan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byOhio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Jonathan D. Uslaner, #2 Exhibit A - Chart of Responses to CalPERS, #3 Exhibit B - Supplemental Joint Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Nasdaq Opening and Closing Crosses, #5 Exhibit D - Comparison of Lax Factors, #6 Exhibit E - List of CalPERS Asset Managers, #7 Exhibit F - Cardinal Health Joint Declaration)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ) filed byCalifornia Public Employees' Retirement System. (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16936460.) filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Levin, Gregg) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregg S. Levin.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/3/2022. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER TERMINATING MOTIONS; REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING; AND CONTINUING HEARINGS. Responses due by 3/18/2022. Replies due by 3/25/2022. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/11/2022. Replies due by 3/18/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argumen t at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 27, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Motions terminated: (25 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST, 25 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:21-cv-08812-JST; 4:21-c v-08873-JST; and 4:21-cv-09041-JST MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Wee Ann Ngian, (19 in 4:21-cv-08873-JST, 19 in 4:21-cv-08873-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Rahul Saraf, (21 in 4:21-cv-09041-JST, 21 in 4:21-cv-09041-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Rahul Saraf, (46 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST, 46 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Rahul Saraf, (49 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST, 49 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by KBC Asset Management NV. Responses due by 3/18/2022. Replies due by 3/25/2022. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/11/2022. Replies due by 3/18/2022.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 3, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #69 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Nick Clegg, Meta Platforms, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) RESPONSE re #68 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, Order,,,,,,,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,, by California Public Employees' Retirement System. (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER RELATING CASES. Motions terminated: (70 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (69) MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Wehner, Nick Clegg, (69 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Wehner, Nick Clegg.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 15, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER FINDING AS MOOT REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP re (32 in 3:22-cv-01261-VC) Order, (67 in 4:21-cv-08812-JST) Order. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 15, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Supplemental Brief re #68 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, Order,,,,,,,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,, filed byCalifornia Public Employees' Retirement System. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Supplemental Brief re #68 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, Order,,,,,,,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,, filed byOhio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/25/2022) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court are the Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and to Consolidate Cases. ECF No. #22 , #27 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, April 28, 2022, is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVING LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (22) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting (22) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (27) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (27) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 4:21-cv-08812-JST. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17418422.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/05/2022 filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rizio-Hamilton, John) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17418365.) filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boon, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17418911.) filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ormsbee, Lauren) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17419003.) filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hollander, Adam) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17419037.) filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John J. Rizio-Hamilton.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rebecca Boon.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren A. McMillen Ormsbee. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Hollander.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeroen van Kwawegen.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17427070.) filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Esmay, John) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17427123.) filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DE Carvalho, Mathews) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadlines for Filing Consolidated Amended Complaint and Briefing on Anticipated Motion to Dismiss] filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System, PFA Pension, Forsikringsaktieselskab, Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Wehner, and Nick Clegg. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/9/2022) Modified on 8/10/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Esmay.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mathews R. de Carvalho.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES FOR FILING CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING ON ANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #90 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2022. Motions due by 1/27/2023. Replies due by 5/26/2023. Responses due by 4/14/2023.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Sophia M. Rios by Rahul Saraf (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 8/17/2022) Modified on 8/18/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) ORDER RE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #94 Notice (Other) filed by Rahul Saraf. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less