Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 07:52:54 (UTC).

Ohayon v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Ohayon filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62166

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eyal Ohayon

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Barclays Bank Delaware

Bank Of America, N.A.

American Express Company

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin E. Zeig

Attorney at Zeig Law Firm, LLC

3595 Sheridan Street, Suite 103

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Alexander Maugans

Attorney at Jones Day

600 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Brandon T. White

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Maureen B Walsh

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

50 North Laura Street, Suite 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Brian Alexander Wolf

Attorney at McGuirewoods LLP

50 N. Laura Street, Suite 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Jason Richard Bowyer

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

50 N. Laura Street, Suite 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Geri Elaine Howell

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Miami Center - Suite 3200, 201 S. Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

John Anthony Love

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A

#27

(#27) UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Brian A. Wolf for Maureen B. Walsh by Bank Of America, N.A.. Attorney Brian Alexander Wolf added to party Bank Of America, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Wolf, Brian) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#26

(#26) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Settlement as to American Express Company by Eyal Ohayon (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#23

(#23) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Bank Delaware identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Delaware Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Bank Delaware (White, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC Only by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Love, John) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#21

(#21) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America, N.A. (Walsh, Maureen) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#13

(#20) ENDORSED ORDER Granting #13 & #15 Motions for Extension of Time. The #13 and #15 Motions are GRANTED as follows: 1) Defendant American Express Company shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 25, 2019. 2) Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/30/2019. (smz) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eyal Ohayon. Barclays Bank Delaware served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#24) ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. It appears that Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's #4 Order, which required Plaintiff to file a statement of claim no later than September 30, 2019. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that no later than October 23, 2019, Plaintiff shall: 1) file a statement of claim; and 2) show cause why sanctions, including dismissal of this action, should not be entered against him. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/21/2019. (smz) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to American Express Company, Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (pcs) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #6

Summon(s) Experian

1 #5

Summon(s) Equifax

1 #4

Summon(s) Boa

1 #3

Summon(s) Barclays

1 #2

Summon(s) Amex

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eyal Ohayon. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Brian A. Wolf for Maureen B. Walsh by Bank Of America, N.A.. Attorney Brian Alexander Wolf added to party Bank Of America, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Wolf, Brian) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Settlement as to American Express Company by Eyal Ohayon (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. It appears that Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's #4 Order, which required Plaintiff to file a statement of claim no later than September 30, 2019. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that no later than October 23, 2019, Plaintiff shall: 1) file a statement of claim; and 2) show cause why sanctions, including dismissal of this action, should not be entered against him. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/21/2019. (smz) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Bank Delaware identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Delaware Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Bank Delaware (White, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC Only by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Love, John) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America, N.A. (Walsh, Maureen) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ENDORSED ORDER Granting #13 & #15 Motions for Extension of Time. The #13 and #15 Motions are GRANTED as follows: 1) Defendant American Express Company shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 25, 2019. 2) Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/30/2019. (smz) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Walsh, Maureen) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Maugans, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eyal Ohayon. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eyal Ohayon. American Express Company served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for Equifax Information Services, LLC (Love, John) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney John Anthony Love added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Love, John) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eyal Ohayon. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eyal Ohayon. Barclays Bank Delaware served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to American Express Company, Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (pcs) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against American Express Company, Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11943015, filed by Eyal Ohayon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Amex, #3 Summon(s) Barclays, #4 Summon(s) Boa, #5 Summon(s) Equifax, #6 Summon(s) Experian)(Zeig, Justin) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARCLAYS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant