Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:42:47 (UTC).

Ohara et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Ohara filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie S. Sneed and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02556

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George Ohara

Diane Boston

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

JPMorgan Chase & Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael George Edison

Attorney at Valrico Law Group P.A.

3626 Erindale Dr

Valrico, FL 33596-6311

Defendant Attorneys

Brian John Lechich

Attorney at Horner Bonner Jacobs Ortiz PA

1441 Brickell Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131-3445

Jose Antonio Ortiz

Attorney at Herron Ortiz, PA

Suite 1060, 255 Alhambra Circle

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Related case(s): No. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase & Co..(Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (SMB) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court Other Documents

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Hillsborough County, case number 19-CA-009424 filed in State Court on 9/12/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16032076 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Related case(s): No. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase & Co..(Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (SMB) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2556-T-30JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Hillsborough County, case number 19-CA-009424 filed in State Court on 9/12/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16032076 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jose Antonio Ortiz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Lechich