This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 08:52:17 (UTC).

Ogletree v. New Prime, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 Ogletree filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against New Prime, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Clifton L Corker and Susan K Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William L Ogletree

Defendants

New Prime, Inc.

Eugene E Butts

GEICO Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danny R Ellis

Attorney at Truck Wreck Justice, PLLC

1419 Market Street

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Stewart Holder

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500

Nashville, TN 37219-8615

Mary Beth Haltom White

Attorney at Lewis Thomason, P.C.

P.O. Box 198615

Nashville, TN 37219

Gary A. Cooper

Attorney at Spears, Moore, Rebman & Williams P.C.

601 Market Street, Suite 400

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk

1 #3

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/2/2022. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/2/2022. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/2/2022. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Complaint by Eugene E Butts, New Prime, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by New Prime, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Cooper, Gary) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Eugene E Butts, New Prime, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. For good cause shown and without objection, the time for Defendants to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 8, 2022. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (RFH) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Eugene E Butts, New Prime, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Cooper, Gary) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. For good cause shown and without objection, the time for Defendants to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to July 25, 2022 (as the requested date of July 23 is a Saturday). This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by New Prime, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Complaint by Eugene E Butts, New Prime, Inc.. (White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/2/2022. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/2/2022. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/2/2022. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by New Prime, Inc. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Circuit Court, case number 22909. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5076835), filed by New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Mary Beth Haltom) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Holder