This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2020 at 12:04:55 (UTC).

Ogden v. CDI Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Ogden filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CDI Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Camille D Bibles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01490

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Camille D Bibles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ogden

Martin Ogden

Glendale, AZ 85304

Defendants

CDI Corporation

Digital Intelligence Systems LLC

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Martin Ogden re: #15 Amended Objection to Report and Recommendations. (1 Page) (REK) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#15

(#15) Amended OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation filed by Martin Ogden. (22 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#14

(#14) LODGED Proposed Second Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration re: #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Martin Ogden. (3 pages) (REK) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint/Petition to Compel Arbitration by Martin Ogden. (3 pages) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (REK) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#12

(#12) OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation filed by Martin Ogden. (16 pages) (REK) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's amended complaint and this case be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees #2 be denied as moot. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within which to file specific written objections with the Court. Thereafter, the parties have fourteen (14) days within which to file a response to the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 8/17/2020. (REK) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

10 #1

Part 2

#10

(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT/ Petition to Compel Arbitration against Digital Intelligence Systems LLC filed by Martin Ogden. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (REK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#8

(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document (Lodged Order) re: #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Martin Ogden. (REK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Martin Ogden. (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT/Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Martin Ogden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Martin Ogden re: #15 Amended Objection to Report and Recommendations. (1 Page) (REK) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation filed by Martin Ogden. (22 Pages) (REK) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LODGED Proposed Second Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration re: #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Martin Ogden. (3 pages) (REK) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint/Petition to Compel Arbitration by Martin Ogden. (3 pages) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (REK) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation filed by Martin Ogden. (16 pages) (REK) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's amended complaint and this case be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees #2 be denied as moot. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within which to file specific written objections with the Court. Thereafter, the parties have fourteen (14) days within which to file a response to the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 8/17/2020. (REK) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT/ Petition to Compel Arbitration against Digital Intelligence Systems LLC filed by Martin Ogden. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (REK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of First Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration by Martin Ogden. (REK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document (Lodged Order) re: #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Martin Ogden. (REK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Martin Ogden. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (REK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#6) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01490-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Martin Ogden. (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT/Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Martin Ogden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (REK) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ogden is a litigant

Latest cases where CDI CORPORATION is a litigant