This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 09:46:24 (UTC).

Offshore Towing Inc v. Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Offshore Towing Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana Douglas and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00462

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Offshore Towing Inc

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Cindy Galpin Martin

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Rufus C. Harris, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alfred Jackson Rufty, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Donald Cole Massey

Attorney at Couhig Partners, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert Tate Martin, II

Attorney at Couhig Partners, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3250

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jonathan Percy Lemann

Attorney at Couhig Partners, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3250

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for May 6, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, MAY 13, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#14

(#14) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

12 #2

Verification of Chris Raley

12 #1

Exhibit A - Master Charter Agreement

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Offshore Towing Inc by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Charter Agreement)(Martin, Robert) (Main Document 12 replaced with a text searchable version of the pdf document and verification separated from the complaint and added as a separate attachment on 4/23/2021: #2 Verification of Chris Raley) (tsf). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Expedite Consideration of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Rec. Doc. No. 9) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 3/26/21. (cg) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #8 Motion for Extension by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Lemann, Jonathan) Modified text/link on 3/25/2021 (pp). Modified text on 3/25/2021 (pp). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

8 #3

Proposed Order

8 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Complaint by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Lemann, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (pp). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number BLAEDC-8763798) filed by Offshore Towing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons)(Martin, Cindy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for May 6, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, MAY 13, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. **All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-savedpdf- files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned.** (pp) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Offshore Towing Inc by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Charter Agreement)(Martin, Robert) (Main Document 12 replaced with a text searchable version of the pdf document and verification separated from the complaint and added as a separate attachment on 4/23/2021: #2 Verification of Chris Raley) (tsf). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Expedite Consideration of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Rec. Doc. No. 9) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 3/26/21. (cg) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer File Responsive Pleadings. **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 4/14/2021. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #8 Motion for Extension by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Lemann, Jonathan) Modified text/link on 3/25/2021 (pp). Modified text on 3/25/2021 (pp). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Complaint by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Lemann, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (pp). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Rec. Doc. #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer File Responsive Pleadings . filed by Offshore Towing Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Cindy) Modified text on 3/24/2021 (pp). Modified text/link on 3/25/2021 (pp). Modified on 3/26/2021 (cg). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer File Responsive Pleadings by Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jonathan Percy Lemann added to party Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC(pty:dft).(Lemann, Jonathan) Modified on 3/23/2021 (pp). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Harris, Rufus) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC. (sbs) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Offshore Towing Inc.(Harris, Rufus) Modified text on 3/5/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Work Cat Trans Gulf, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number BLAEDC-8763798) filed by Offshore Towing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons)(Martin, Cindy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Offshore Towing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Tate Martin, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Cole Massey