This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 06:59:01 (UTC).

Official Committee of Tort Claimants v. PG&E Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Official Committee of Tort Claimants filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against PG E Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04567

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellants

Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico

York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund

City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System

Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund

Appellee

PG&E Corporation

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Tort Claimants

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells

San Francisco, CA 94177

Trustee

U.S. Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

James Leon Ostaszewski

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Michael P. Canty

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Carol C. Villegas

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Willow E. Radcliffe

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Hadiya Khan Deshmukh

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Appellee Attorneys

Andriana Georgallas

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Jane Kim

Attorney at Keller and Benvenutti LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Max Africk

Attorney at Weil, Gotshall & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Peter J. Benvenutti

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti LLP

650 California St., 19Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Thomas B. Rupp

Attorney at Keller and Benvenutti LLP

650 California St. #1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Thomas Bogdan Rupp

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Tobias S. Keller

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti

650 California Street, Suite 1900, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Chris Bator

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

3200 National City Center, 1900 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph M. Esmont

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square #2000

Cleveland, OH 44147

Robert Alan Julian, Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94111-2806

Trustee Attorneys

Marta Elena Villacorta

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

450 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 05-0153

San Francisco, CA 94102

Timothy S. Laffredi

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee-San Jose

280 South First Street, Suite 268

San Jose, CA 95113

Cameron Gulden

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

300 Booth Street, Room 3009

Reno, NV 89509

Jason Blumberg

Attorney at Office of the U.S.Trustee

501 I Street, #7-500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Lynette C. Kelly

Attorney at Office of he United States Trustee

Phillip J. Burton Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

55 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#31

30 #1

Representation Statement

#30

#29

#26

#25

#24

#23

#19

1 #9

Docket Report Pt. 5

1 #8

Docket Report Pt. 4

1 #6

Docket Report Pt. 2

1 #5

Docket Report Pt. 1

1 #4

Order Confirming Ch 11 Plan

1 #3

Court's Certificate of Mailing

1 #2

Certificate of Service re Appeal

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) USCA Case Number 21-16507 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #30 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case #29 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-16372164 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 9/9/2021) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT'S RULING ON INSURANCE DEDUCTION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/10/2021. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. taking the pending Dkt. No. #19 motion to dismiss under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for May 13, 2021 is VACATED. If the Court determines that it wants to hear oral argument on the merits briefing, it will so inform the parties and schedule a date. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #19 motion to dismiss, previously set for May 13th will be held on that date before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:30 p.m. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Statement re #23 Opposition/Response to Motion, Statement of Appellees the Reorganized Debtors With Respect to the Brief of Securities Plaintiffs-Appellants in Opposition to Appellee-TCC's Motion to Dismiss the Appeal as Moot [Dkt. No. 23] by PG&E Corporation. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion of Appellee the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, and Co-Appellants ) filed byOfficial Committee of Tort Claimants. (Richardson, David) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion of Appellee the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, and Co-Appellants ) Statement of Appellees the Reorganized Debtors with Respect to the Official Committee of Tort Cliamants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 19] filed byPG&E Corporation. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion of Appellee the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, and Co-Appellants ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #22 filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***DISREGARD, RE-FILED AT DOCKET #23 .*** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion of Appellee the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, and Co-Appellants ) filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 3/9/2021) Modified on 3/10/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume VI of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume V of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume IV of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume III of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume II of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume I of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Appellant's BRIEF (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Record on Appeal Documents)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088. File received electronically. Filed by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund, Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Certificate of Service re Appeal, #3 Court's Certificate of Mailing, #4 Order Confirming Ch 11 Plan, #5 Docket Report Pt. 1, #6 Docket Report Pt. 2, #7 Docket Report Pt. 3, #8 Docket Report Pt. 4, #9 Docket Report Pt. 5)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant