This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 10:16:17 (UTC).

Offen v. USAA General Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Offen filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. Reid Neureiter, Raymond P. Moore and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judges

N. Reid Neureiter

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Offen

Defendant

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Ty Hotchkiss

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy A. Moseley

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Hannah Rachel Seifert

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 February 2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#28

(#28) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/18/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#27

(#27) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 February 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set on February 18, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is rescheduled to 10:30 a.m. on that same morning. (Time Change Only). All other aspects of this Court's January 20, 2021 order (ECF #15 ) remain in effect. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#26

(#26) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Hannah R. Seifert by Hannah Rachel Seifert on behalf of USAA General Indemnity CompanyAttorney Hannah Rachel Seifert added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#21

(#21) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 February 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #20 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#20

(#20) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company All parties do not consent.. (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#15

(#27) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 February 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set on February 18, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is rescheduled to 10:30 a.m. on that same morning. (Time Change Only). All other aspects of this Court's January 20, 2021 order (ECF #15 ) remain in effect. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #7

State Court - Pretrial Order

1 #6

State Court - Delay Reduction Order

1 #5

State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond

1 #4

State Court - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond

1 #3

State Court - Affidavit of Service

1 #2

State Court - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from District Court, Denver, County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV034228. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7673153), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 State Court - Summons and Complaint, #3 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #4 State Court - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #5 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #6 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 State Court - Pretrial Order, #8 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 February 2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/18/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 February 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set on February 18, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is rescheduled to 10:30 a.m. on that same morning. (Time Change Only). All other aspects of this Court's January 20, 2021 order (ECF #15 ) remain in effect. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Hannah R. Seifert by Hannah Rachel Seifert on behalf of USAA General Indemnity CompanyAttorney Hannah Rachel Seifert added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#23) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #21 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-130-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 February 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #20 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company All parties do not consent.. (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Martin Foster Egelhoff, District Court Judge, Denver County on 01/07/2021. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon USAA General Indemnity Company on 12/16/2020. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Jason Offen.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Jason Offen (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Ty Hotchkiss on behalf of Jason OffenAttorney Joshua Ty Hotchkiss added to party Jason Offen(pty:pla) (Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA General Indemnity Company. (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from District Court, Denver, County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV034228. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7673153), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 State Court - Summons and Complaint, #3 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #4 State Court - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #5 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #6 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 State Court - Pretrial Order, #8 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Ty Hotchkiss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Anton Sirchio