This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2021 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

Off-White LLC v. Afters Ice Cream, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Off-White LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Afters Ice Cream, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02121

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Off-White LLC

Defendant

Afters Ice Cream, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter J. Farnese

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

700 South Flower Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Clifford L White

Attorney at Myers Law Group

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Nicholas Duane Myers

Attorney at Myers Law Group

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Befores, LLC d/b/a Afters Ice Cream, erroneously sued and served as Afters Ice Cream, Inc., (White, Clifford) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Befores, LLC d/b/a Afters Ice Cream, erroneously sued and served as Afters Ice Cream, Inc..(Attorney Clifford L White added to party Afters Ice Cream, Inc.(pty:dft))(White, Clifford) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC, upon Defendant Afters Ice Cream, Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicholas D. Myers in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney William C. Wright on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jason M. Drangel on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Brian Igel on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Kerry B. Brownlee on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Ashley E. Sands on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William C. Wright. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason M. Drangel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Afters Ice Cream, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC, (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Off-White LLC. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28841735 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party Off-White LLC(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clifford L. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Duane Myers