This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 07:24:53 (UTC).

Odom v. Suero et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Odom filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Suero. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00364

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rebecca Lynne Odom

Rebecca Lynne Holman

Defendants

Enoc Suero

John Does

American Van Lines Inc

Brandon Flynn

Robilyn Gordon

Amanda Payne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randal Hastings Hobbs

Attorney at Rainwater, Holt & Sexton P.A.

Post Office Box 17250

Little Rock, AR 72222-7250

Anthony Bryce Brewer

Attorney at Bryce Brewer Law Firm, LLC

2120 East Kiehl Avenue

Sherwood, AR 72120

Defendant Attorney

Mark Steven Breeding

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero.(Breeding, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#11

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom. Summons issued as to Robilyn Gordon, Brandon Flynn, Amanda Payne and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #6 motion to withdraw counsel; directing the Clerk to terminate Mr. Hobbs as counsel of record for Ms. Odom; granting #9 Ms. Odom's amended motion for leave to file amended complaint; directing Ms. Odom to file her amended complaint within 10 days from the entry of this Order; and denying as moot #8 Ms. Odom's motion for leave to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bryce Brewer on behalf of Rebecca Lynne Odom (Brewer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Hobbs, Randal) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint , filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom. Enoc Suero served on 5/11/2019. (Hobbs, Randal) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero. (cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero.(cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom with Jury Demand against All Defendants.(cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-2956. Fee $400 receipt number LIT072239. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero.(Breeding, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom. Summons issued as to Robilyn Gordon, Brandon Flynn, Amanda Payne and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #6 motion to withdraw counsel; directing the Clerk to terminate Mr. Hobbs as counsel of record for Ms. Odom; granting #9 Ms. Odom's amended motion for leave to file amended complaint; directing Ms. Odom to file her amended complaint within 10 days from the entry of this Order; and denying as moot #8 Ms. Odom's motion for leave to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bryce Brewer on behalf of Rebecca Lynne Odom (Brewer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Hobbs, Randal) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint , filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom. Enoc Suero served on 5/11/2019. (Hobbs, Randal) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero. (cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero.(cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom with Jury Demand against All Defendants.(cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-2956. Fee $400 receipt number LIT072239. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.