This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:29:50 (UTC).

Odom et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Odom filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00160

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Odom, Sr.

Joy Odom

Defendants

Tyson Foods, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. doing business as Wal-Mart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Douglas Lee

Attorney at LEE LAW FIRM, LLC

140 Mayfair Road, Suite 1900

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Defendant Attorneys

William Trey E. Jones, III

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Jeffrey P. Hubbard

Attorney at HUBBARD, MITCHELL, WILLIAMS & STRAIN, PLLC

P. O. Box 13309

Jackson, MS 39236

Stacey L. Strain

Attorney at HUBBARD, MITCHELL, WILLIAMS & STRAIN, PLLC

P. O. Box 13309

Jackson, MS 39236

Taylor B. McNeel

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Biloxi

P. O. Box 127

Biloxi, MS 39533-0127

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.'s Answer due by 12/30/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 18, 2019 (KPM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney and to Withdraw. The motion is granted as to the withdrawal of Jeffrey Hubbard and Stacey Strain and the substitution of W. Trey Jones as Mr. Jones has appeared. Any additional attorneys who desire to be listed as counsel for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP shall file an entry of appearance. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 18, 2019 (KPM) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney , MOTION to Withdraw by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Hubbard, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 , #6 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (CS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tyson Foods, Inc. answer due 12/16/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 26, 2019 (KPM) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc. (McNeel, Taylor) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. answer due 12/16/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 12, 2019 (KPM) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Hubbard, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Odom, Michael Odom, Sr. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Lee, Kenneth) Modified on 12/2/2019 (CS). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joy Odom, Michael Odom, Sr. Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Lee, Kenneth) Modified on 12/2/2019 (CS). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey L. Strain on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Hubbard on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Hubbard, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (CS) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tyson Foods, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4121269), filed by Joy Odom, Michael Odom, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Wal-Mart Supercenter #593 is a litigant

Latest cases where Tyson Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor B. McNeel(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey P. Hubbard