Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:54:58 (UTC).

Odem v. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Odem filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00934

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abdul Odem

Defendant

Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather M. Collins

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Anne Hunter

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Ashley S. Walter

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorney

Katherine D. Boyte

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith, & Prophete, LLP (Nashville Office)

401 Commerce Street, Suite 1010

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s answer is due 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/04/2020. (ln) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#11

(#11) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Boyte, Katherine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Boyte, Katherine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Boyte on behalf of Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Boyte, Katherine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on November 30, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 11:30 a.m. on January 11, 2021, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/02/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Abdul Odem. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. served on 11/13/2020. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/2/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3246412), filed by Abdul Odem. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Katherine D. Boyte admitted to this court. (dt) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s answer is due 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/04/2020. (ln) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Boyte, Katherine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Boyte, Katherine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Boyte on behalf of Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Boyte, Katherine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on November 30, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 11:30 a.m. on January 11, 2021, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/02/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Abdul Odem. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. served on 11/13/2020. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter and Ashley S. Walter admitted to this court. (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/2/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3246412), filed by Abdul Odem. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSOCIATED WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. is a litigant