This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:27:40 (UTC).

Octave Music Licensing et al v. Club Arcada, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Octave Music Licensing filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Club Arcada, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07071

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WB Music Corp.

Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp.

Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.

Octave Music Licensing

Octave Music Licensing doing business as Octave Music Publ Corp.

Defendants

Ronald Onesti

Club Arcada, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keith M. Stolte

Attorney at TottisLaw

One East Wacker Dr. #1205, #1205

Chicago, IL 60601

Monica L. Thompson

Attorney at TottisLaw

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60601

Kevin Tottis

Attorney at TottisLaw

1 East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octave Music Licensing, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. as to Club Arcada, Inc. on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octave Music Licensing, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. as to Ronald Onesti on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/8/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/30/2019. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. by Keith M. Stolte (Stolte, Keith) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16379624.(Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octave Music Licensing, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. as to Club Arcada, Inc. on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octave Music Licensing, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. as to Ronald Onesti on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/8/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/30/2019. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Club Arcada, Inc., Ronald Onesti. (ec, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. by Keith M. Stolte (Stolte, Keith) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Octave Music Licensing d/b/a Octave Music Publ Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16379624.(Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WB Music Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Tottis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica L. Thompson