This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2021 at 08:37:09 (UTC).

O'Connor v. Selective Way Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 O'Connor filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Way Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malachy E Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James J. O'Connor

Defendant

Selective Way Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J. Conaboy

Attorney at Abrahamsen Conaboy & Abrahamsen, P.C.

1006 Pittston Avenue

Scranton, PA 18505

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey M Brenner

Attorney at Post & Schell, PC

Four Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, 14Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Steven J. Schildt

Attorney at POST & SCHELL

1600 Jfk Boulevard, 13Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#15

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

8 #12

Exhibit(s)

8 #11

Exhibit(s)

8 #10

Exhibit(s)

8 #9

Exhibit(s)

8 #8

Exhibit(s)

8 #7

Exhibit(s)

8 #6

Exhibit(s)

8 #3

Exhibit(s)

8 #2

Exhibit(s)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2021. Fact Discovery due by 10/29/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 10/29/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 11/26/2021. Supplemental due by 12/17/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 1/28/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2022. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/31/21. (bs) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by James J. O'Connor.(Conaboy, James) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT by James J. O'Connor. (Conaboy, James) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Schildt, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schildt, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Presently before the court is plaintiffs amended complaint. (Doc. 8) Based upon this filing, the defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 3) is DISMISSED without prejudice.dismissing #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/26/21 (bs) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Selective Way Insurance Company, filed by James J. O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s))(Conaboy, James) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Approving #6 Stipulation, filed by James J. O'Connor. (See order for details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/19/21. (bs) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by James J. O'Connor, filed by James J. O'Connor. Related document: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conaboy, James) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2021 11:00 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. It is counsels obligation to supply the conference contact information to opposing counsel and the court. This can be placed on the docket under seal or supplied independently to opposing counsel and the court, in order to protect the privacy and security of the teleconference. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/16/21. (bs) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/4/21. (bs) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Way Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County (case number 2020 cv 3636). (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5456916)filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit- State Court Complaint and Exhibits, #3 Exhibit- Notice of Removal filed in Lackawanna County Case)(dw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES J. CONABOY