Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 06:24:23 (UTC).

O'Connor v. BW Greenville LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 O'Connor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BW Greenville LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald C Coggins, Jr and Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00300

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donald C Coggins, Jr

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Debra OConnor

Debra O'Conner

Defendants

Britton L McCorkle

Whats For Dinner LLC

Coffman Management LLC

Thomas E Wicker

Raymond S Coffman

Todd A Justice

KCD Holdings LLC

Justice Family Trust One LLC

BW Greenville LLC

Valerie Brewer

Bottle Cap Management Group LLC

TEW Lets Eat LLC

Valerie Brewer Individually and as principal/agent/employee of BW Greenville, LLC d/b/a Brazwells Premium Pub

BW Greenville LLC doing business as Brazwells Premium Pub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Camden Hodge

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Eric Poulin

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Roy T Willey, IV

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street, Unit B

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant Attorneys

Francis M Ervin, II

Attorney at Rogers Townsend and Thomas

4000 Faber Place Drive, Suite 300

North Charleston, SC 29405

Joshua Robert Hinson

Attorney at Rogers Townsend and Thomas PC

Po Box 100200

Columbia, SC 29202

James Geoffrey Osborn, Jr

Attorney at Rogers Townsend and Thomas PC

Po Box 100200

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY by BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Coffman Management LLC, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC to #14 Order. (kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER directing Defendants BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Coffman Management LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC and Justice Family Trust One LLC to inform the court of the citizenship of all its members or partners within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/19/19. (kmca) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by James Geoffrey Osborn, Jr on behalf of BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Valerie Brewer, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, Todd A Justice, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Britton L McCorkle, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC, Thomas E Wicker (Osborn, James) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/19/19. (kmca) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#11

(#11) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/22/2019, ADR Statement due by 4/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/3/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/2/2019, Discovery due by 9/3/2019, Motions due by 9/17/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/19/19. (kmca) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 4/1/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/15/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#6

(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/7/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/1/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/28/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/25/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/15/2019, Discovery due by 8/14/2019, Motion in Limine due by 10/15/2019, Motions due by 8/28/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/22/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 11/12/2019, Mediation Due by 9/11/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/15/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Valerie Brewer, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, Todd A Justice, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Britton L McCorkle, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC, Thomas E Wicker.(Ervin, Francis) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Debra OConnor.(Hodge, James) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Valerie Brewer, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, Todd A Justice, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Britton L McCorkle, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC, Thomas E Wicker.(abuc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

1 #2

Acceptance of Service

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-23-05979. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8246664), filed by Britton L McCorkle, Whats For Dinner LLC, BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Justice Family Trust One LLC, Valerie Brewer, Thomas E Wicker, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Todd A Justice. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Acceptance of Service)(abuc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY by BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Coffman Management LLC, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC to #14 Order. (kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER directing Defendants BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Coffman Management LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC and Justice Family Trust One LLC to inform the court of the citizenship of all its members or partners within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/19/19. (kmca) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by James Geoffrey Osborn, Jr on behalf of BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Valerie Brewer, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, Todd A Justice, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Britton L McCorkle, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC, Thomas E Wicker (Osborn, James) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/19/19. (kmca) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/22/2019, ADR Statement due by 4/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/3/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/2/2019, Discovery due by 9/3/2019, Motions due by 9/17/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/19/19. (kmca) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 4/1/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. (kmca) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number is 6-19-cv-300-TMC. Please make a note of it for all future filings and Judge's preferences. (kmca) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • (#8) Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Timothy M Cain. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 4/1/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/15/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/7/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/1/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/28/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/25/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/15/2019, Discovery due by 8/14/2019, Motion in Limine due by 10/15/2019, Motions due by 8/28/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/22/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 11/12/2019, Mediation Due by 9/11/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/15/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Valerie Brewer, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, Todd A Justice, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Britton L McCorkle, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC, Thomas E Wicker.(Ervin, Francis) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Debra OConnor.(Hodge, James) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, Valerie Brewer, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, Todd A Justice, Justice Family Trust One LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Britton L McCorkle, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Whats For Dinner LLC, Thomas E Wicker.(abuc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-23-05979. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8246664), filed by Britton L McCorkle, Whats For Dinner LLC, BW Greenville LLC, Bottle Cap Management Group LLC, TEW Lets Eat LLC, Justice Family Trust One LLC, Valerie Brewer, Thomas E Wicker, Raymond S Coffman, Coffman Management LLC, KCD Holdings LLC, Todd A Justice. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Acceptance of Service)(abuc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Collins Hodges

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Poulin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roy T. Willey IV