Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:30:45 (UTC).

O'Connell et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 O'Connell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Catherine O'Connell

Dennis O'Connell

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Trapp

407 West Public Square

Smithville, TN 37166

Defendant Attorneys

Elle G. Kern

Attorney at Howell & Fisher, PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Suite 550

Nashville, TN 37203

George Andrew Rowlett

Attorney at Howell & Fisher, PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Suite 550

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Allow Associate Attorney Elle G. Kern to Attend Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/19/19. (gb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Allow Associate Attorney Elle G. Kern to Attend Initial Case Management Conference by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#8

(#8) AGREED HIPAA ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/13/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

7 #1

Attachment Agreed HIPAA Order

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed HIPAA Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Agreed HIPAA Order)(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/24/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 03:00 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#2

(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #4

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Attachment Notice of Filing to State Court

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from DeKalb County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CV-34. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2957458) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Attachment Notice of Filing to State Court, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Allow Associate Attorney Elle G. Kern to Attend Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/19/19. (gb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Allow Associate Attorney Elle G. Kern to Attend Initial Case Management Conference by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AGREED HIPAA ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/13/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed HIPAA Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Agreed HIPAA Order)(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/24/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 03:00 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeremy Trapp, George Andrew Rowlett and Elle G. Kern. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from DeKalb County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CV-34. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2957458) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Attachment Notice of Filing to State Court, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elle G Kern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George A Rowlett