This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/01/2021 at 09:04:13 (UTC).

Ocean Semiconductor LLC v. NVIDIA Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 Ocean Semiconductor LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NVIDIA Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01211

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ocean Semiconductor LLC

Defendant

NVIDIA Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Chan

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M. Holmes

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sean San-Chul Pak

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Scott L. Cole

5209 Spanish Oaks Club Blvd.

Austin, TX 78738

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

1 #24

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: NVIDIA Corporation answer due 3/12/2021. (am) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including March 12, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew M. Holmes for NVIDIA Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean San-Chul Pak for NVIDIA Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott L. Cole for attorney Andrew M. Holmes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14415151) by on behalf of NVIDIA Corporation. (Cole, Scott) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/26/2021) (am). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott L. Cole for attorney Sean S. Pak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14415029) by on behalf of NVIDIA Corporation. (Cole, Scott) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/26/2021) (am). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by NVIDIA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Semiconductor LLC (Chan, Alex) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ocean Semiconductor LLC. NVIDIA Corporation served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Chan, Alex) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter for Timothy Devlin. (bw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to NVIDIA Corporation. (bw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Chan, Alex) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ocean Semiconductor LLC. (Chan, Alex) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14331604), filed by Ocean Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chan, Alex) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nvidia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Semiconductors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Chan