This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 08:02:10 (UTC).

Ocean Garden Products Incorporated v. Mayorquin et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Ocean Garden Products Incorporated filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Mayorquin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria S Davila and Rosemary Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Maria S Davila

Rosemary Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ocean Garden Products Incorporated

Defendants

David Mayorquin

ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV

Viviana Lopez

Abraham Mayorquin

ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC

Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV

Amanda Lopez Vergara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Mannion

Attorney at Blakely LLP - Irvine, CA

18500 Von Karman Ave., Ste. 530

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Marc Saffer

Attorney at Rusing Lopez & Lizardi PLLC

6363 N Swan Rd., Ste. 151

Tucson, AZ 85718

Sarah Suzanne Letzkus

Attorney at Rusing Lopez & Lizardi PLLC

6363 N Swan Rd., Ste. 151

Tucson, AZ 85718

Michael John Rusing

Attorney at Rusing Lopez & Lizardi PLLC

6363 N Swan Rd., Ste. 151

Tucson, AZ 85718

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#24

(#24) *MOTION to Dismiss Party Pacific Ocean Harges, S. De R.L. De C.V. by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Saffer, Jonathan) *LR 42 motion filed in the wrong case; attorney notice to refile document in correct case on 7/9/2019 (KEP). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#23

(#23) *MOTION to Dismiss Party ADAB Ocean Harvest, S. De R.L. De C.V. by ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Saffer, Jonathan) *LR 42 motion filed in the wrong case; attorney notice to refile document in correct case on 7/9/2019 (KEP). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Amanda Lopez Vergara.(Saffer, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16949350. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Davila. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV19-284-TUC-MSD. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

3 #6

Summons

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Amanda Lopez Vergara.(Saffer, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Party Pacific Ocean Harges, S. De R.L. De C.V. filed by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case (CV-18-322-TUC-RM LEAD CASE) and using the proper event under "LR 42 Motions". Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party ADAB Ocean Harvest, S. De R.L. De C.V. filed by ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case (CV-18-322-TUC-RM LEAD CASE) and using the proper event under "LR 42 Motions". Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) *MOTION to Dismiss Party Pacific Ocean Harges, S. De R.L. De C.V. by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Saffer, Jonathan) *LR 42 motion filed in the wrong case; attorney notice to refile document in correct case on 7/9/2019 (KEP). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) *MOTION to Dismiss Party ADAB Ocean Harvest, S. De R.L. De C.V. by ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Saffer, Jonathan) *LR 42 motion filed in the wrong case; attorney notice to refile document in correct case on 7/9/2019 (KEP). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Amanda Lopez Vergara.(Saffer, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER GRANTING (144) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:18-cv-00322-RM. The above-entitled action shall be consolidated with Case No. 19-cv-00284-FRZ for all motions, discovery, pretrial proceedings, and trial. The consolidated case will proceed in this Court and all future filings will be made in this case as the lead case. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING 143 Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Oppose Dismissal Motion. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to ADAB Ocean Harvest's Motion to Dismiss is extended to 7/12/19. Within 3 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall re-file the Complaint filed on 5/22/19, in Case No. 4:19-cv-00284-FRZ in this case and the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 7/3/19. Discovery due no later than 11/13/19; Dispositive Motions due on or before 12/20/19; A Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due on or before 12/21/19. Unless expressly modified by this Order, all dates and directions to the parties in the original 27 Scheduling Order remain in full force and effect. The parties' 145 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Interrogatories is DENIED AS MOOT, as the parties do not need the Court's approval for such a time extension. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/24/19. (Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00322-RM, 4:19-cv-00284-FRZ) (BAC) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases on Consent of all Parties (re-filed per Notice of Deficiency, Doc. 142)) by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint in UFTA Action, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-18-00322-TUC-RM,CV-19-00284-TUC-FRZ) (Mannion, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint in UFTA Action, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-18-00322-TUC-RM,19-CV-00284-TUC-FRZ) (Mannion, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER the Stipulation (Doc. #13 ) is approved. The date for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including July 1, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 6/10/2019. (KEP) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV. (Saffer, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Rule 408 Settlement Communications, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order 17-08 and Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Checklist upon Abraham Mayorquin on 5/23/2019. (KEP) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David M Mannion on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney notified to correct file pro hac motion into master case which has been done. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David M. Mannion by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing (C.D. Cal.), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mannion, David) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to ADAB Ocean Harvest LLC, ADAB Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Viviana Lopez, Abraham Mayorquin, David Mayorquin, Pacific Ocean Harvest S De RL De CV, Amanda Lopez Vergara. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16949350. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Davila. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV19-284-TUC-MSD. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16949350 filed by Ocean Garden Products Incorporated. (Mannion, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less