This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:07:43 (UTC).

OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. v. THE JEWELRY CHANNEL, et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart, Robin L. Rosenberg and Dave Lee Brannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81608

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judges

Bruce E. Reinhart

Dave Lee Brannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Defendants

THE JEWELRY CHANNEL

VAIBHAV GLOBAL LIMITED

THE JEWELRY CHANNEL formerly doing business as LIQUIDATION CHANNEL doing business as SHOP LC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Martin Bernhardt

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins LLC

505 South Flagler Drive, Suite 300

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Craig Stuart Distel

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins LLC

505 S. Flagler Drive, Suite 300

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorneys

Clinton Sawyer Payne

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Jane C. Schlicht

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

100 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 2600

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Exhibit Request for Service Aboard

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Intent to Serve Non-Party Subpoena by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Service Aboard)(Distel, Craig) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Stuart Distel on behalf of OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. Attorney Craig Stuart Distel added to party OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(pty:pla). (Distel, Craig) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#25

(#25) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint as to Counts I, III and V by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. (Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count IV and Time-Barred as to Count II by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#23

(#23) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL identifying Corporate Parent VAIBHAV GLOBAL LIMITED, Corporate Parent Genoa Jewelers Limited for THE JEWELRY CHANNEL (Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

21 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jane C. Schlicht. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12286702 by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. Responses due by 1/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

9 #2

Summon(s) Upon Vaibhav Global

9 #1

Summon(s) Upon The Jewelry Channel

#9

(#10) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. re #6 Notice (Other) filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC., #9 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) upon The Jewerly Channel, #2 Summon(s) Vaibhav Global Limited) (Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE/ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

6 #3

Summon(s) upon Vaibhav Global

6 #2

Summon(s) upon The Jewelry Channel

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#10) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. re #6 Notice (Other) filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC., #9 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) upon The Jewerly Channel, #2 Summon(s) Vaibhav Global Limited) (Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#24) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count IV and Time-Barred as to Count II by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Intent to Serve Non-Party Subpoena by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Service Aboard)(Distel, Craig) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Stuart Distel on behalf of OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. Attorney Craig Stuart Distel added to party OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(pty:pla). (Distel, Craig) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint as to Counts I, III and V by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. (Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count IV and Time-Barred as to Count II by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL identifying Corporate Parent VAIBHAV GLOBAL LIMITED, Corporate Parent Genoa Jewelers Limited for THE JEWELRY CHANNEL (Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #21 . Wisconsin-based attorney Jane C. Schlicht, Esq. may appear and participate in this action as counsel for corporate Defendant The Jewelry Channel, Inc. The Clerk shall provide e-notice of all filings to jschlicht@hinshawlaw.com. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/8/2020. (jrz) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jane C. Schlicht. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12286702 by THE JEWELRY CHANNEL. Responses due by 1/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Clinton) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Discovery due by 8/6/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed joint scheduling order)(Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Defendant The Jewelry Channel's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/24/2019. (sk01) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. re #6 Notice (Other) filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC., #9 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) upon The Jewerly Channel, #2 Summon(s) Vaibhav Global Limited) (Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. re #6 Notice (Other) filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC., 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es), #1 Complaint filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Upon The Jewelry Channel, #2 Summon(s) Upon Vaibhav Global) (Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • (#8) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. (jas) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE/ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) upon The Jewelry Channel, #3 Summon(s) upon Vaibhav Global) (Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Jurisdiction when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against THE JEWELRY CHANNEL, f/d/b/a LIQUIDATION CHANNEL n/d/b/a SHOP LC, VAIBHAV GLOBAL LIMITED. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12184807, filed by OCEAN COMMUNICATIONS, INC..(Bernhardt, Peter) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jane Carolyn Schlicht

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clinton Sawyer Payne