This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2019 at 08:13:27 (UTC).

Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina v. Black et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Black. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03070

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina

Defendants

Tera DeMeyer

Allison Black

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy A. Price

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings LLP

200 W. Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Defendant Attorneys

M. Grant Ragland

Attorney at Mayo Law Offices

P.O. Box 1385

Fayetteville, AR 72702

Johnny L. Nichols

Attorney at Johnny L. Nichols Attorney at Law PLC

P.O. Box 298, 703 South Pine Street

Harrison, AR 72602-0298

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized disbursement in the amount of $96,000.00 (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 21, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335); authorizing a deposit in the amount of $96,000.00; Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 21, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Allison Black. (Nichols, Johnny) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny L. Nichols on behalf of Allison Black. (Nichols, Johnny) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section1335) by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

11 #1

Affidavit file-marked Affidavit of Service

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina re #10 Affidavit of Service, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit file-marked Affidavit of Service)(Price, Troy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service (DeMeyer)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service (Black)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. Allison Black served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Tera DeMeyer served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service (Black), #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service (DeMeyer))(Price, Troy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES PAID ELECTRONICALLY with Pay.gov Tracking ID 26KEB0FR and Agency Tracking ID 1988369 by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

2 #8

Exhibit H - Redacted copy of email dated 4.4.2019 from Occidental to Black

2 #7

Exhibit G - Redacted copy of death certificate of Amy Villines

2 #6

Exhibit F - Redacted copy of death certificate of John Villines

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized disbursement in the amount of $96,000.00 (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 21, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335); authorizing a deposit in the amount of $96,000.00; Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 21, 2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Allison Black. (Nichols, Johnny) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny L. Nichols on behalf of Allison Black. (Nichols, Johnny) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section1335) by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina re #10 Affidavit of Service, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit file-marked Affidavit of Service)(Price, Troy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. Allison Black served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Tera DeMeyer served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service (Black), #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service (DeMeyer))(Price, Troy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES PAID ELECTRONICALLY with Pay.gov Tracking ID 26KEB0FR and Agency Tracking ID 1988369 by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***PLEASE DISREGARD. Refund Application to be filed.***REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES PAID ELECTRONICALLY with Pay.gov Tracking ID 26KEB0FR and Agency Tracking ID 1988369 by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Price, Troy) Modified docket text and document security on 9/26/2019 (mfr). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Civil Cover Sheet, #1 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:M. Grant Ragland. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (lgd) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Allison Black, Tera DeMeyer and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Tera DeMeyer, as Administratrix of the Estate of Amy Villines for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,,,,,. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Allison Black, as Administratrix of the Estate of John Villines for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,,,,,. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Allison Black, Tera DeMeyer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1988417), filed by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted copy of Policy No. xxxxxx8600, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted copy of Application for Policy No. xxxxxx8600, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted copy of Claimants Statement signed by Black dated 3.18.2019, #4 Exhibit D - Boone County Circuit Court Order dated 2.27.2019, #5 Exhibit E - Boone County Circuit Court Order dated 2.21.2019, #6 Exhibit F - Redacted copy of death certificate of John Villines, #7 Exhibit G - Redacted copy of death certificate of Amy Villines, #8 Exhibit H - Redacted copy of email dated 4.4.2019 from Occidental to Black, #9 Exhibit I - Copy of summary page of autopsy report of Amy Villines, #10 Exhibit J - Copy of summary page of autopsy report of John Villines, #11 Exhibit K - Redacted copy of letter dated 5.10.2019 from Occidental to DeMeyer, #12 Exhibit L - Redacted copy of correspondence from Occidental to Black extending deadline to 7.19.2019, #13 Exhibit M - Redacted copy of correspondence from Occidental to DeMeyer extending deadline to 7.19.2019, #14 Exhibit N - Redacted copy of letter from counsel for Black dated 7.10.2019, #15 Exhibit O - Redacted copy of Claimants Statement signed by DeMeyer dated 8.1.2019)(Price, Troy) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Occidental Life Insurance Company of North Carolina. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less