This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2021 at 11:20:51 (UTC).

Ocasio v. Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.

Case Summary

On June 22, 2021, Odemaris Ocasio (“Plaintiff”), represented by Anthony P. Facchini and Robert J. Rzeszutek of Facchini and Facchini, PC, filed this personal injury action against Six Flags Great Escape, LP, d/b/a Six Flags Great Escape Lodge and Indoor Waterpark (“Defendant”) for alleged injuries suffered while visiting the Defendant’s waterpark. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts with Judge Mark G. Mastroianni presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleges that “Plaintiff and her family were staying at the Defendant’s resort. On July 5, 2019, Plaintiff and her family chose to leave the indoor waterpark and go to the outdoor waterpark. Plaintiff and her family inquired with the Defendant’s staff about the best way to get to the outdoor water park. The Defendant’s staff member, who was on duty and acting on behalf of the Defendant, told Plaintiff and her family to use an emergency exit that led down a grassy incline. After initial objection by Plaintiff’s family, Defendant’s staff member reassured Plaintiff that use of the exit to access the outdoor waterpark was acceptable and safe. While walking down the incline as directed, Plaintiff slipped and fell. As Plaintiff fell, she immediately felt pain in her left ankle and noticed that it had started to swell and she could not put pressure on it. Plaintiff was rushed to the hospital, where x-rays revealed the Plaintiff had broken her ankle in the fall.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleges that “Due to her injuries, the Plaintiff was prevented from earning an income as a licensed real estate agent in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts.”

 

The Plaintiff has laid down the following claims for relief: alleged negligence, alleged negligence hiring, retention, and supervision, and alleged negligent training. 

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to order a judgment against the defendant in an amount to be determined by the Court, inclusive of attorney’s fees, interests and costs, in addition to any other such relief that this Court deems just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-30073

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Odemaris Ocasio

Defendant

Six Flags Great Escape, L.P. doing business as Six Flags Great Escape Lodge & Indoor Waterpark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony P. Facchini

Attorney at Facchini & Facchini P.C.

824 Liberty Street, P.O. Box 4052

Springfield, MA 01101-4052

Defendant Attorneys

Heather M. Eichenbaum

Attorney at Spector Gadon Rosen Vinci P.C.

Seven Penn Center 1635 Market Street - 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Daniel R. Sonneborn

Attorney at Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pachios LLP

60 State Street, Suite 1100

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Odemaris Ocasio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Facchini, Anthony) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

8 #3

Affidavit Exhibit C - Affidavit of R.J. Elrick

8 #2

Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service

8 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C - Affidavit of R.J. Elrick)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

7 #3

Affidavit Exhibit C - Affidavit of R.J. Elrick

7 #2

Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service

7 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C - Affidavit of R.J. Elrick)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

6 #1

Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heather M. Eichenbaum

#6

(#6) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Heather M. Eichenbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8865911 by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heather M. Eichenbaum)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Odemaris Ocasio. Six Flags Great Escape, L.P. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Odemaris Ocasio. (Facchini, Anthony) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

16 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#17) Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Northern District of New York and assigned civil case number 1:21-cv-00997. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#16) Case transferred to to District of Northern New York;. Original file with documents numbered 1-15, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and transferring this case to the Northern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1631. Plaintiff, a Massachusetts resident, was injured while at a water park located in New York. The water park was operated by Defendant, a limited partnership formed under New York law, with a principal place of business in New York, and two limited partners: a New York corporation and an Ohio corporation. Defendant challenged this court's personal jurisdiction, placing on Plaintiff the burden to establish this court's general or specific jurisdiction over Defendant. Cossart v. United Excel Corp., 804 F.3d 13, 18, 20 (1st Cir. 2015). At this early stage, the court applies the prima facie approach, "asking only whether the plaintiff has proffered facts that, if credited, would support all findings 'essential to personal jurisdiction.'" Kuan Chen v. U.S. Sports Acad., Inc., 956 F.3d 45, 51 (1st Cir. 2020). "To make such a showing, the plaintiff cannot rely solely on conclusory averments but must 'adduce evidence of specific facts.'" Id. at 54 (quoting Foster-Miller, Inc. v. Babcock & Wilcox Can., 46 F.3d 138, 145 (1st Cir. 1995)). For general jurisdiction, this requires facts sufficient to establish Defendant's "affiliations with the State are so 'continuous and systematic' as to render them essentially at home in the forum State." Goodyear Dunlop Tires Ops., S.A. v. Brown, 564 U.S. 915, 919 (2011). Specific jurisdiction requires a showing that the case relates sufficiently to, or arises from, a significant subset of contacts between the defendant and the forum. Kuan Chen, 956 F.3d at 55 (internal quotations omitted).Plaintiff's factual allegations do not satisfy this standard as to either general or specific jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Complaint is nearly devoid of allegations supporting personal jurisdiction over Defendant. When conclusory allegations are disregarded, all that remains are factual allegations that Defendants advertising reaches Massachusetts and "derives substantial revenue from interstate commerce." (Compl., Dkt. No. 1, para. 8.) The only additional evidence Plaintiff has offered to bolster her position is her own affidavit, in which she states that Defendant's advertising induced her to travel to the water park and that she has been aware of Defendant's advertising, both on the internet and radio, for many years. These facts fall well short of rendering Defendant "essentially at home" in Massachusetts or demonstrating the necessary connection between the alleged tort and Defendants contacts with Massachusetts. See e.g. Marino v. Hyatt Corp., 793 F.2d 427 (1st Cir. 1986) (finding evidence that defendant advertised, solicited business, and operated a hotel in Massachusetts insufficient for general jurisdiction and evidence that Hawaii hotel room was booked in Massachusetts insufficient for specific jurisdiction over claims arising from tort that occurred in Hawaii hotel).Finally, having found Plaintiff has not met her burden of establishing this court's personal jurisdiction over Defendant, the court transfers this action to the Northern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1631, noting also that both Plaintiff and Defendant have proposed such a transfer. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Counsel for Defendant should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include Leave to file granted on (date of order) in the caption of the document. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Odemaris Ocasio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Facchini, Anthony) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Heather M. Eichenbaum. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Zamorski, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C - Affidavit of R.J. Elrick)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C - Affidavit of R.J. Elrick)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Heather M. Eichenbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8865911 by Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heather M. Eichenbaum)(Sonneborn, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Odemaris Ocasio. Six Flags Great Escape, L.P. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Odemaris Ocasio. (Facchini, Anthony) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Six Flags Great Escape, L.P.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Six Flags Great Escape, L.P. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8829270 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Odemaris Ocasio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Facchini, Anthony) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less