This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 11:10:30 (UTC).

Cara OCallaghan v. Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Cara OCallaghan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02289

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jenee Misraje

Cara O'Callaghan

Cara OCallaghan

Defendants

Attorney General of California

Regents of The University of California

Teamsters Local 2010

Xavier Becerra

Janet Napolitano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian K Kelsey

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 South Lasalle Street Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Mark W Bucher

Attorney at Law Office of Mark W Bucher

18001 Irvine Boulevard Suite 108

Tustin, CA 92780

Reilly W Stephens

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 South Lasalle Street Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Charles F Robinson

Attorney at University of California

1111 Franklin Street 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607-5200

Margaret L Wu

Attorney at University of California

1111 Franklin Street, 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Rhonda Stewart Goldstein

Attorney at The Regents of the University of California

1111 Franklin Street 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Gilbert J Tsai

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Dorothy Sheng-Ing Liu

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Andrew H Baker

Attorney at Beeson Tayer & Bodine

483 Ninth Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94607

Maureen C Onyeagbako

Attorney at CAAG - Office of Attorney General

1300 I Street Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Lara Haddad

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

54 #2

Proposed Order

54 #1

Exhibit

#54

(#54) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Onyeagbako, Maureen) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

53 #2

Proposed Order

53 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#53

(#53) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Teamsters Local 2010. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#52

(#52) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Cara OCallaghan, Jenee Misraje(Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#51

(#51) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having been informed by the parties in this action that they submit on the Courts tentative ruling previously issued, hereby rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: For the following reasons the Court denies the motion for a preliminary injunction. (See document for further details) (es) Modified on 6/10/2019 (NEF regenerated) (es). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

49 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Bucher, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian K. Kelsey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#2

(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cara O'Callaghan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23450938) #2 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an APPLICATION, not an Ex Parte, not a Motion or Request.. (lt) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#52) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Cara OCallaghan, Jenee Misraje(Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Onyeagbako, Maureen) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Teamsters Local 2010. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Cara OCallaghan, Jenee Misraje(Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having been informed by the parties in this action that they submit on the Courts tentative ruling previously issued, hereby rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: For the following reasons the Court denies the motion for a preliminary injunction. (See document for further details) (es) Modified on 6/10/2019 (NEF regenerated) (es). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Local Rule 40-1] #49 by Judge James V. Selna. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby continued to September 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., to be heard in conjunction with the hearing on Defendants' motions for dismissal and partial dismissal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference from July 8, 2019 to September 9, 2019 filed by Defendant Teamsters Local 2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #47 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiffs are granted an extension until May 29, 2019 to file their Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (es) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiffs Jenee Misraje, Cara OCallaghan. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on motion to extend time to file reply in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction) (Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) REPLY IN SUPPORT for Preliminary Injunction. Motion #26 filed by Plaintiffs Jenee Misraje, Cara OCallaghan. (Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Onyeagbako, Maureen) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian K. Kelsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jenee Misraje, Cara OCallaghan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23471516) filed by Plaintiffs Jenee Misraje, Cara OCallaghan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Brian Kelsey) (Bucher, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cara O'Callaghan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23450938) #2 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an APPLICATION, not an Ex Parte, not a Motion or Request.. (lt) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Bucher, Mark) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian K. Kelsey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cara O'Callaghan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23450938) filed by Plaintiff Cara O'Callaghan. (Bucher, Mark) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23449168 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Cara O'Callaghan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mark W Bucher added to party Cara O'Callaghan(pty:pla))(Bucher, Mark) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian K. Kelsey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark W Bucher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reilly Stephens