This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2023 at 06:33:46 (UTC).

In re Pareteum Securities Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 In re Pareteum Securities Litigation was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09767

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin O'Brien

Marco Scaccia

Tri Doan

John Vargo

Jacob Friedman

Chang Lee, M.D.

Keith M Moore

James A. Lisi

Kevin Ivkovich

Clarence Bassarath

Cynthia Soto

Robert E Whitley

Ajay Singh

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Victor Bozzo

Pareteum Corporation

Denis McCarthy

Edward O'Donnell

Yves Van Sante

Luis Jimenez-Tunon

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Gateway Securities LLC

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Bradley Linkh

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 358

New York, NY 10169

Phillip C. Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Jeffrey Craig Block

Attorney at Block & Leviton LLP

155 Federal Street, Suite 1303

New York, NY 10013

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Melinda Ann Nicholson

Attorney at Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163

Melissa Hope Harris

Attorney at Kahn, Swick & Foti, LLC

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey James Chapman

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

1251 Avenue Of Americas, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Chardaie Claire Charlemagne

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Transamerica Pyramid Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorneys

Joshua Wolf Ruthizer

Attorney at Wolf Popper LLP

845 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Robert Craig Finkel

Attorney at Wolf Popper LLP

845 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Other Attorneys

Gregory Mark Nespole

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

55 Broadway, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

William Scott Holleman

Attorney at Julie & Holleman LLP

157 East 86Th Street, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10028

Michael J Palestina

Attorney at Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163

Lawrence P. Eagel

Attorney at Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C.

810 Seventh Avenue, Ste 620

New York, NY 10019

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#277

(#277) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 10/12/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09767-AKH, 1:19-cv-09795-AKH, 1:19-cv-09849-AKH, 1:20-cv-03738-AKH.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#276

RESTRICTED

#275

(#275) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE OF PENDENCY: This Court, having reviewed and considered the Settling Parties' Stipulations of Settlement dated July 14, 2022 and September 7, 2022 and their Amended Stipulations of Settlement dated October 25, 2022, and Plaintiffs' motion for an order preliminarily approving the Settlement, ORDERS: As set forth herein. The Settlement Fairness Hearing shall be held before this Court on April 25, 2023 at 10:30 a.m., at the united States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14D, New York, NY 10007. The following schedule of dates shall govern the resolution of this Settlement: as set forth herein.SO ORDERED., ( Fairness Hearing set for 4/25/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09767-AKH, 1:19-cv-09795-AKH, 1:19-cv-09849-AKH, 1:20-cv-03738-AKH (ama) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

274 #6

Exhibit B - Proposed final judgment

274 #5

Exhibit A-4 - Postcard Notice

274 #4

Exhibit A-3 - Summary Notice

274 #3

Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim

274 #2

Exhibit A-1 - Long-form notice

274 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed preliminary approval order

274 #274

Main Document

273 #5

Exhibit A-4 - Postcard Notice

273 #3

Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

458 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#277) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 10/12/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09767-AKH, 1:19-cv-09795-AKH, 1:19-cv-09849-AKH, 1:20-cv-03738-AKH.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#276) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 10/12/2022 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09767-AKH, 1:19-cv-09795-AKH, 1:19-cv-09849-AKH, 1:20-cv-03738-AKH.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketTerminate Transcript Deadlines Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09767-AKH, 1:19-cv-09795-AKH, 1:19-cv-09849-AKH, 1:20-cv-03738-AKH(ama) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#275) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE OF PENDENCY: This Court, having reviewed and considered the Settling Parties' Stipulations of Settlement dated July 14, 2022 and September 7, 2022 and their Amended Stipulations of Settlement dated October 25, 2022, and Plaintiffs' motion for an order preliminarily approving the Settlement, ORDERS: As set forth herein. The Settlement Fairness Hearing shall be held before this Court on April 25, 2023 at 10:30 a.m., at the united States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14D, New York, NY 10007. The following schedule of dates shall govern the resolution of this Settlement: as set forth herein.SO ORDERED., ( Fairness Hearing set for 4/25/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09767-AKH, 1:19-cv-09795-AKH, 1:19-cv-09849-AKH, 1:20-cv-03738-AKH (ama) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#274) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Amended Stipulation of Settlement. Document filed by Kevin Ivkovich, Stephen D Jones, Keith M Moore, Nicholas Steffey, Robert E Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed preliminary approval order, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Long-form notice, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Summary Notice, #5 Exhibit A-4 - Postcard Notice, #6 Exhibit B - Proposed final judgment).(Miller, Kim) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#273) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Amended Stipulation of Settlement. Document filed by Kevin Ivkovich, Stephen D Jones, Keith M Moore, Nicholas Steffey, Robert E Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed preliminary approval order, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Long-form notice, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Summary Notice, #5 Exhibit A-4 - Postcard Notice, #6 Exhibit B - Proposed final judgment).(Miller, Kim) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#272) LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Kim E. Miller dated December 16, 2022 re: entry of Comfort Order and revision of Settlement documents. Document filed by Kevin Ivkovich, Stephen D Jones, Keith M Moore, Nicholas Steffey, Robert E Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comfort Order, #2 Exhibit Redline of Indiv Defs' Stipulation, #3 Exhibit Redline of Squar Milner Stipulation, #4 Exhibit Redline of proposed preliminary approval order, #5 Exhibit Redline of long-form notice, #6 Exhibit Redline of proposed final approval order, #7 Exhibit Proposed preliminary approval order).(Miller, Kim) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#271) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #270 Letter, filed by Nicholas Steffey, Stephen D Jones, Kevin Ivkovich, Keith M Moore, Robert E Whitley. ENDORSEMENT: Accepted for filing. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/15/2022) (rro) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#270) LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Kim E. Miller dated November 14, 2022 re: status of pending motion for Comfort Order in Pareteum's bankruptcy proceedings. Document filed by Kevin Ivkovich, Stephen D Jones, Keith M Moore, Nicholas Steffey, Robert E Whitley..(Miller, Kim) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#269) SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a preliminary settlement approval hearing on October 12, 2022, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 14D. No later than October 5, 2022, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit to the court (via the email address HellersteinNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a list of all counsel expected to appear on the record, along with their contact information. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/21/2022) (jca) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen G. Foresta on behalf of Victor Bozzo, Denis McCarthy, Edward O'Donnell, Pareteum Corporation. (Foresta, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Pareteum Corporation served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service was accepted by HEATHER HOWIE, DESIGNEE. Document filed by Kevin O'Brien. (Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victor Bozzo, Denis McCarthy, Edward O'Donnell, Pareteum Corporation. (dnh) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kevin O'Brien. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pareteum Corporation, Victor Bozzo, Edward O'Donnell and Denis McCarthy, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin O'Brien. (Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Victor Bozzo, Denis McCarthy, Edward O'Donnell, Pareteum Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17817310)Document filed by Kevin O'Brien.(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gateway Securities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pareteum Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Palestina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Nespole